|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1909 | 02/1909 | General | Boiler number G255 (Diagram 56) |
||||
1911 | 11/1911 | General | Boiler number G331 (Diagram 56) |
||||
1919 | 12/1919 | General | Boiler number D1013 (Diagram 56) |
||||
Darlington Works | 16/05/1923 | 30/07/1923 | 76 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/01/1926 | 28/04/1926 | 106 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 19/08/1929 | 08/10/1929 | 51 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/08/1933 | 25/09/1933 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 2269 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/04/1936 | 10/06/1936 | 57 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/12/1938 | 17/01/1939 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 2068 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/05/1941 | 30/06/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 21/02/1944 | 14/03/1944 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 2232 (Diagram 56) |
||
Gateshead Works | 10/08/1945 | 22/08/1945 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1946 | 28/12/1946 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2281 (Diagram 56) |
||
Gateshead Works | 15/01/1948 | 24/02/1948 | 41 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3261 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1902 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 527 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 1 02 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
16/05/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1923. Dep: 30/07/1923. | ||
13/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1926. Dep: 28/04/1926. | ||
19/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1929. Dep: 08/10/1929. | ||
15/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1933. Dep: 25/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2269 (Diagram 56) |
||
15/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1936. Dep: 10/06/1936. | ||
02/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1938. Dep: 17/01/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2068 (Diagram 56) |
||
26/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1941. Dep: 30/06/1941. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
21/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1944. Dep: 14/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2232 (Diagram 56) |
||
10/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/08/1945. Dep: 22/08/1945. | ||
19/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3261 | ||
26/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1946. Dep: 28/12/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2281 (Diagram 56) |
||
13/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
15/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/01/1948. Dep: 24/02/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3261 |
||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63261 but not taken up | ||
1950 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
31/10/1950 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3261 from Borough Gardens (54C) |