|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1910 | 02/1910 | General | Boiler number G72 (Diagram 56) |
||||
1919 | 12/1919 | General | Boiler number D1010 (Diagram 56) |
||||
Darlington Works | 22/04/1924 | 31/07/1924 | 101 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/03/1926 | 25/05/1926 | 57 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 19/10/1927 | 14/01/1928 | 88 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 14/01/1930 | 06/02/1930 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 10/03/1932 | 26/04/1932 | 48 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/07/1935 | 23/09/1935 | 56 days | General | Boiler number D2159 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/03/1938 | 09/05/1938 | 41 days | General | Boiler number D572 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/05/1938 | 17/05/1938 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/06/1940 | 06/08/1940 | 64 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1941 | 22/07/1941 | 64 days | General | Boiler number D1955 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1942 | 02/09/1942 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/11/1943 | 11/12/1943 | 26 days | General | Boiler number D1441 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/12/1945 | 14/12/1945 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 28/01/1946 | 28/02/1946 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/11/1947 | 19/12/1947 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 2804 (Diagram 56B) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1902 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1002 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 2 02 Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
05/1910 | Modification | Diagram 56 number G74 boiler fitted | ||
22/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1924. Dep: 31/07/1924. | ||
26/08/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
30/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/03/1926. Dep: 25/05/1926. | ||
26/05/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
19/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1927. Dep: 14/01/1928. | ||
14/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/01/1930. Dep: 06/02/1930. | ||
10/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1932. Dep: 26/04/1932. | ||
09/10/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (NBH) | ||
30/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1935. Dep: 23/09/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2159 (Diagram 56) |
||
30/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1938. Dep: 09/05/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number D572 (Diagram 56) |
||
09/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/05/1938. Dep: 17/05/1938. | ||
04/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/06/1940. Dep: 06/08/1940. | ||
20/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1941. Dep: 22/07/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1955 (Diagram 56) |
||
12/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/08/1942. Dep: 02/09/1942. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
16/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1943. Dep: 11/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1441 (Diagram 56) |
||
04/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/12/1945. Dep: 14/12/1945. | ||
20/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3262 | ||
28/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/01/1946. Dep: 28/02/1946. | ||
20/07/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
13/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1947. Dep: 19/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2804 (Diagram 56B) |
||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63262 but not taken up | ||
1950 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
22/08/1950 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3262 from Selby (50C) |