|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1919 | 11/1919 | General | Boiler number D1004 (Diagram 56) |
||||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1923 | 14/04/1923 | 82 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 07/09/1925 | 11/12/1925 | 96 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 03/11/1927 | 06/01/1928 | 65 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 03/07/1929 | 29/08/1929 | 58 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/08/1933 | 04/09/1933 | 35 days | General | Boiler number D1364 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/04/1934 | 26/06/1934 | 84 days | Heavy | Boiler number D1768 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/10/1936 | 18/11/1936 | 49 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1939 | 29/01/1940 | 49 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1941 | 09/01/1942 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2153 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/10/1943 | 01/12/1943 | 56 days | General | Boiler number D1955 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/01/1944 | 06/01/1944 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 14/03/1946 | 29/03/1946 | 16 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3265 |
||
Darlington Works | 25/03/1947 | 25/03/1947 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1902 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1704 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 5 02 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
23/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1923. Dep: 14/04/1923. | ||
07/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1925. Dep: 11/12/1925. | ||
03/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/11/1927. Dep: 06/01/1928. | ||
03/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1929. Dep: 29/08/1929. | ||
01/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1933. Dep: 04/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1364 (Diagram 56) |
||
04/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 04/04/1934. Dep: 26/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1768 (Diagram 56) |
||
01/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1936. Dep: 18/11/1936. | ||
06/02/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
12/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1939. Dep: 29/01/1940. | ||
12/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1941. Dep: 09/01/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2153 (Diagram 56) |
||
07/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1943. Dep: 01/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1955 (Diagram 56) |
||
05/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/01/1944. Dep: 06/01/1944. | ||
22/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
14/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/03/1946. Dep: 29/03/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3265 |
||
25/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 25/03/1947. Dep: 25/03/1947. | ||
26/04/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3265 from Newport (Teeside) (NPT) |