|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1910 | 09/1910 | General | |||||
1914 | 01/1914 | General | Boiler number G258 (Diagram 56) |
||||
1919 | 10/1919 | General | |||||
1922 | 09/1922 | General | Boiler number D1427 (Diagram 56) |
||||
Darlington Works | 24/10/1923 | 23/11/1923 | 31 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/02/1925 | 17/04/1925 | 73 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/09/1927 | 30/11/1927 | 70 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/02/1930 | 15/04/1930 | 51 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 27/10/1932 | 28/11/1932 | 33 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/04/1936 | 11/06/1936 | 72 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/10/1939 | 30/12/1939 | 68 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/01/1942 | 09/02/1942 | 24 days | General | Boiler number D1432 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/04/1944 | 11/05/1944 | 21 days | General | Boiler number 2080 (Diagram 56) |
||
Gateshead Works | 22/03/1945 | 09/04/1945 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 05/03/1946 | 30/03/1946 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 3132 (Diagram 56B) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3268 |
||
Gateshead Works | 26/03/1947 | 11/04/1947 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1948 | 23/01/1948 | 1 day | No repairs | Tender only |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1902 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1717 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 8 02 Allocated to Starbeck (SBK) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
07/09/1910 | Modification | Diagram 56 number G72 boiler fitted | ||
07/10/1919 | Modification | Diagram 56 number D1921 boiler fitted | ||
24/10/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1923. Dep: 23/11/1923. | ||
04/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1925. Dep: 17/04/1925. | ||
22/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1927. Dep: 30/11/1927. | ||
24/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1930. Dep: 15/04/1930. | ||
09/04/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
05/05/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
27/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1932. Dep: 28/11/1932. | ||
01/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1936. Dep: 11/06/1936. | ||
24/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1939. Dep: 30/12/1939. | ||
17/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1942. Dep: 09/02/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1432 (Diagram 56) |
||
21/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1944. Dep: 11/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2080 (Diagram 56) |
||
22/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/03/1945. Dep: 09/04/1945. | ||
05/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1946. Dep: 30/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3132 (Diagram 56B) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3268 |
||
26/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/03/1947. Dep: 11/04/1947. | ||
23/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 23/01/1948. Dep: 23/01/1948. Work undertaken: Tender only |
||
02/1948 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
07/02/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3268 from Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63268 but not taken up |