|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1920 | 03/1920 | General | Boiler number D1043 (Diagram 56) |
||||
Darlington Works | 28/03/1923 | 12/06/1923 | 77 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1926 | 28/07/1926 | 139 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1926 | 05/10/1926 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1928 | 28/11/1928 | 52 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 26/01/1932 | 24/02/1932 | 30 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 03/09/1936 | 16/10/1936 | 44 days | General | Boiler number D1403 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/03/1940 | 29/03/1940 | 26 days | General | Boiler number D1470 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/10/1942 | 25/11/1942 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2233 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/03/1945 | 06/04/1945 | 32 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 30/09/1946 | 15/10/1946 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 22/10/1947 | 21/11/1947 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2886 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1951 | 10/08/1951 | 1 day | No repairs | Tender only |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1951 | Locomotives still not renumbered | Although it is well over three years since the B.R. renumbering scheme was introduced, there were several classes with a small percentage still not renumbered (or at any rate not advised as done) at the end of June-Class B16 (69 survivors): Nos. 1419/23/33. Class D20 (28 survivors): Nos. 2360/72/95. Class Q5 (4 survivors): Nos. 3270, 3311/4/26. Of this large class, only 9 received B.R. numbers, the last to be done being 63313(2/12/48). None of the renumbered engines survives. Class Q6 is completely renumbered, No. 63342 having just been done. Class Q7 (15 engines): all done except. No. 3460. Class J21 (37 survivors): all done except 5025, 5117/22. Class J24 (6 survivors): not renumbered are 5623 (Scotland) and 5644. Class J25 (57 survivors): all done except 5663/7/86, 5727. (5699 has become 65699 but no trace of advice). Class J26 was completed on 19/5/51 when 65769 was done. Class J27 (115 engines): all done except 5890/4. Class G5 (106 survivors): all renumbered by 31/3/51. Class J71 (76 survivors): twelve to be done, Nos. 8230/1/9/47/9/51/4/72/98, 8304/11/6-an unusually large percentage not dealt with. Class J77 (38 survivors): Nos. 8405/38 not renumbered. Class J72 (113 engines): to be renumbered 8672/81, 8730(?), 8748. Class N10 (19 survivors): all done (?except 9095). | SLS/195108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1902 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1682 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 30 02 Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
28/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1923. Dep: 12/06/1923. | ||
12/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1926. Dep: 28/07/1926. | ||
17/09/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/09/1926. Dep: 05/10/1926. | ||
19/03/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
08/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1928. Dep: 28/11/1928. | ||
26/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1932. Dep: 24/02/1932. | ||
03/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1936. Dep: 16/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1403 (Diagram 56) |
||
04/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1940. Dep: 29/03/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1470 (Diagram 56) |
||
28/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1942. Dep: 25/11/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2233 (Diagram 56) |
||
06/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1945. Dep: 06/04/1945. | ||
18/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3270 | ||
30/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/09/1946. Dep: 15/10/1946. | ||
22/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1947. Dep: 21/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2886 (Diagram 56B) |
||
14/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Normanton (20D) | ||
20/11/1948 | Allocation | |||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63270 but not taken up | ||
14/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Malton (50F) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Malton (50F) | ||
11/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
17/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
08/1951 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
10/08/1951 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3270 from York (North) (50A) | ||
10/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 10/08/1951. Dep: 10/08/1951. Work undertaken: Tender only |