|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1911 | 02/1911 | General | |||||
Darlington Works | 21/08/1923 | 29/10/1923 | 70 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 16/05/1924 | 10/06/1924 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 14/01/1927 | 30/03/1927 | 76 days | General | Boiler number D1769 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/10/1929 | 29/11/1929 | 47 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/02/1932 | 26/02/1932 | 16 days | Heavy | Boiler number D1380 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/10/1934 | 02/11/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number D1441 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1938 | 24/11/1938 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2168 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/03/1941 | 05/05/1941 | 57 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 16/06/1943 | 15/07/1943 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 3126 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Gateshead Works | 27/06/1945 | 05/07/1945 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1946 | 30/11/1946 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2929 (Diagram 56B) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1903 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 162 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 11 03 Allocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
07/02/1911 | Modification | Diagram 56 number D2097 boiler fitted | ||
21/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1923. Dep: 29/10/1923. | ||
16/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/05/1924. Dep: 10/06/1924. | ||
14/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1927. Dep: 30/03/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1769 (Diagram 56) |
||
14/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1929. Dep: 29/11/1929. | ||
11/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 11/02/1932. Dep: 26/02/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1380 (Diagram 56) |
||
05/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1934. Dep: 02/11/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1441 (Diagram 56) |
||
25/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1938. Dep: 24/11/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2168 (Diagram 56) |
||
10/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1941. Dep: 05/05/1941. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
16/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1943. Dep: 15/07/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3126 (Diagram 56B) |
||
27/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/06/1945. Dep: 05/07/1945. | ||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3275 | ||
31/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1946. Dep: 30/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2929 (Diagram 56B) |
||
13/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
15/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63275 but not taken up | ||
18/04/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3275 from Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
05/1949 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |