|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1913 | 02/1913 | General | Boiler number D1918 (Diagram 56) |
||||
Darlington Works | 19/02/1925 | 26/05/1925 | 97 days | General | Boiler number D1454 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/08/1925 | 07/09/1925 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 07/01/1929 | 19/02/1929 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/11/1931 | 11/01/1932 | 43 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/11/1934 | 07/12/1934 | 24 days | General | Boiler number D1380 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1938 | 09/07/1938 | 46 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1939 | 28/12/1939 | 65 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 21/10/1941 | 22/11/1941 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2798 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1943 | 23/12/1943 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 2800 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/05/1945 | 07/06/1945 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 03/12/1945 | 17/12/1945 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 23/02/1946 | 27/03/1946 | 33 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3276 |
||
Darlington Works | 06/08/1947 | 12/09/1947 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2153 (Diagram 56) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1903 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1696 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 2 03 Allocated to Shildon (SHI) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
19/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1925. Dep: 26/05/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1454 (Diagram 56) |
||
07/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/08/1925. Dep: 07/09/1925. | ||
07/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1929. Dep: 19/02/1929. | ||
30/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1931. Dep: 11/01/1932. | ||
15/08/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ferryhill (Co. Durham) (FER) | ||
14/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1934. Dep: 07/12/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1380 (Diagram 56) |
||
25/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1938. Dep: 09/07/1938. | ||
07/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
29/06/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
25/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 25/10/1939. Dep: 28/12/1939. | ||
21/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1941. Dep: 22/11/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2798 (Diagram 56B) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
26/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1943. Dep: 23/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2800 (Diagram 56B) |
||
22/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/05/1945. Dep: 07/06/1945. | ||
23/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
03/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/12/1945. Dep: 17/12/1945. | ||
23/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/02/1946. Dep: 27/03/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3276 |
||
06/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1947. Dep: 12/09/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2153 (Diagram 56) |
||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63276 but not taken up | ||
02/1950 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
20/02/1950 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3276 from Selby (50C) |