|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1913 | 04/1913 | General | Boiler number G253 (Diagram 56) |
||||
1917 | 12/1917 | General | |||||
Darlington Works | 01/11/1923 | 11/01/1924 | 72 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/07/1927 | 13/10/1927 | 81 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/09/1929 | 06/11/1929 | 44 days | General | Boiler number D562 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/05/1932 | 03/06/1932 | 32 days | General | Boiler number D602 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/02/1935 | 29/03/1935 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2227 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1938 | 04/03/1938 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2906 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/01/1939 | 17/02/1939 | 38 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 19/12/1940 | 18/01/1941 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 3127 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1942 | 12/12/1942 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/09/1943 | 02/10/1943 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 3117 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Gateshead Works | 25/11/1944 | 09/12/1944 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 30/01/1946 | 23/02/1946 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 2806 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/12/1947 | 02/01/1948 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2225 (Diagram 56) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1903 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 650 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 12 03 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
07/12/1917 | Modification | Diagram 56 number D716 boiler fitted | ||
01/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1923. Dep: 11/01/1924. | ||
25/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1927. Dep: 13/10/1927. | ||
24/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1929. Dep: 06/11/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number D562 (Diagram 56) |
||
03/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1932. Dep: 03/06/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D602 (Diagram 56) |
||
26/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1935. Dep: 29/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2227 (Diagram 56) |
||
02/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1938. Dep: 04/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2906 (Diagram 56B) |
||
11/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/01/1939. Dep: 17/02/1939. | ||
12/06/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
19/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1940. Dep: 18/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3127 (Diagram 56B) |
||
23/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/11/1942. Dep: 12/12/1942. | ||
08/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1943. Dep: 02/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3117 (Diagram 56B) |
||
25/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/11/1944. Dep: 09/12/1944. | ||
30/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1946. Dep: 23/02/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2806 (Diagram 56B) |
||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3280 | ||
02/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1947. Dep: 02/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2225 (Diagram 56) |
||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63280 but not taken up | ||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
10/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
16/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
25/10/1950 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3280 from Selby (50C) | ||
11/1950 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |