|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1913 | 10/1913 | General | Boiler number D1929 (Diagram 56) |
||||
1917 | 08/1917 | General | |||||
1920 | 06/1920 | General | Boiler number D1053 (Diagram 56) |
||||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1923 | 15/10/1923 | 98 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/08/1925 | 29/09/1925 | 44 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/11/1926 | 23/02/1927 | 91 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 18/07/1928 | 16/08/1928 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 10/02/1930 | 29/03/1930 | 48 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1933 | 07/09/1933 | 31 days | General | Boiler number D1961 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/04/1936 | 23/06/1936 | 62 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/01/1939 | 03/02/1939 | 25 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/07/1941 | 06/09/1941 | 41 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 26/04/1944 | 20/05/1944 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 2886 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Gateshead Works | 09/10/1945 | 26/10/1945 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 01/02/1946 | 07/03/1946 | 35 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 10/09/1947 | 10/10/1947 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 3371 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1951 | 13/06/1951 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1903 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1757 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 7 03 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
07/08/1917 | Modification | Diagram 56 number G295 boiler fitted | ||
10/07/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1923. Dep: 15/10/1923. | ||
17/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/08/1925. Dep: 29/09/1925. | ||
25/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1926. Dep: 23/02/1927. | ||
18/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/07/1928. Dep: 16/08/1928. | ||
10/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1930. Dep: 29/03/1930. | ||
08/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1933. Dep: 07/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1961 (Diagram 56) |
||
23/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1936. Dep: 23/06/1936. | ||
10/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1939. Dep: 03/02/1939. | ||
28/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1941. Dep: 06/09/1941. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
26/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1944. Dep: 20/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2886 (Diagram 56B) |
||
09/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/10/1945. Dep: 26/10/1945. | ||
01/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/02/1946. Dep: 07/03/1946. | ||
01/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3284 | ||
10/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1947. Dep: 10/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3371 (Diagram 56B) |
||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63284 but not taken up | ||
06/1951 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
13/06/1951 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3284 from Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
13/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 13/06/1951. Dep: 13/06/1951. |