|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1920 | 02/1920 | General | |||||
Darlington Works | 19/06/1923 | 30/08/1923 | 73 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/05/1926 | 29/09/1926 | 125 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 03/12/1928 | 18/01/1929 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 2168 (Diagram 56) |
||
Gateshead Works | 22/01/1930 | 06/02/1930 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 22/06/1933 | 02/08/1933 | 42 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 05/10/1938 | 14/11/1938 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 2281 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1940 | 28/11/1940 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2150 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1942 | 16/07/1942 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1942 | 01/01/1943 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D1392 (Diagram 56) |
||
Gateshead Works | 30/08/1944 | 21/09/1944 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1946 | 24/08/1946 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 2080 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/04/1948 | 06/04/1948 | 4 days | No repairs | |||
Gateshead Works | 08/04/1948 | 10/05/1948 | 33 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63286 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. | SLS/194806 |
30/04/1949 | Darlington Works | New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84. Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460. |
SLS/194906 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1903 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 785 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 16 03 Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
07/02/1920 | Modification | Diagram 56 number D1023 boiler fitted | ||
19/06/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1923. Dep: 30/08/1923. | ||
10/10/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
30/01/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
28/05/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1926. Dep: 29/09/1926. | ||
21/02/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
03/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1928. Dep: 18/01/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2168 (Diagram 56) |
||
13/05/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
14/10/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annfield Plain (AFP) | ||
22/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/01/1930. Dep: 06/02/1930. | ||
22/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1933. Dep: 02/08/1933. | ||
24/06/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
29/03/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
05/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1938. Dep: 14/11/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2281 (Diagram 56) |
||
31/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1940. Dep: 28/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2150 (Diagram 56) |
||
23/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/06/1942. Dep: 16/07/1942. | ||
26/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1942. Dep: 01/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1392 (Diagram 56) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
30/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/08/1944. Dep: 21/09/1944. | ||
10/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1946. Dep: 24/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2080 (Diagram 56) |
||
05/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3286 | ||
15/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
21/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
03/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 03/04/1948. Dep: 06/04/1948. | ||
08/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/04/1948. Dep: 10/05/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63286 |
||
04/1949 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
11/04/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63286 from Selby (SEL) |