|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/1913 | 07/10/1913 | General | Boiler number G185 (Diagram 56) |
||||
1921 | 02/1921 | General | |||||
Darlington Works | 05/04/1924 | 17/06/1924 | 74 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/01/1928 | 27/03/1928 | 68 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/01/1931 | 20/02/1931 | 39 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1935 | 08/05/1935 | 48 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 23/08/1938 | 23/09/1938 | 32 days | General | Boiler number D1013 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/05/1941 | 26/09/1941 | 138 days | General | Boiler number 3224 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/09/1943 | 23/10/1943 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2276 (Diagram 56) |
||
Gateshead Works | 18/08/1944 | 07/09/1944 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/06/1947 | 20/08/1947 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 3127 (Diagram 56B) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/08/1947 | Darlington Works | The following newly painted locos. were observed on shed here on 19/8: W.D. Nos. 77129, 77209, 77431, 78514 and 79204, together with 'D49' 2708 THJ. On the same day the following newly painted locos. were seen in the Works' yard: 'D49' 2738; 'Q5' 3287; 'J21' 5108; 'J24' 5604; 'J25' 5689 and ex H. & B. 'N13' 9113; whilst the following were stripped but not marked for scrapping: 'J24' 5636; 'J25' 5648/71/81/99, 5701; 'Q5' 3276/78/83/93. Further locos. also stripped were: 'D49' 2727; 'J26' 5731/60/73/77; 'Ql' 9931; W.D. Nos. 77365 (ex N.S. No. 4364) and 77162 (ex N.S. No. 4482). 'T1' 9919, 9921 and 'J77' 8429 TWD were in the Erecting Shop, whilst the frames for the new Class 'Bl' locos. were laid up to No. 1036. 'A2' 507 was in the Works yard but has since been noted in traffic while 'A2' 511 was in Stooperdale boiler yard. 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 77080 (ex N.S. No. 4330), 77225, 77306 and 77456 were stored in the Paint Shop with the cab fittings removed. The electric locos. that were previously stored had been removed. The scrap yard contained 'J21' 5053 which was almost completely cut up. The scrapping of 'Cl' No. 2845 had been commenced and outside the Works yard Nos. 2825, 2855 and 2879 were awaiting their doom. Owing to the large number of 'CI's' now being withdrawn it is quite impossible for them all to be broken up at Doncaster and consequently a number of these engines are being dealt with at Darlington. | SLS/194710 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1903 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 792 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 17/O3 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
07/02/1921 | Modification | Diagram 56 number D1074 boiler fitted | ||
05/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1924. Dep: 17/06/1924. | ||
20/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1928. Dep: 27/03/1928. | ||
13/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1931. Dep: 20/02/1931. | ||
22/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1935. Dep: 08/05/1935. | ||
23/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1938. Dep: 23/09/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1013 (Diagram 56) |
||
12/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1941. Dep: 26/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3224 (Diagram 56B) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
30/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1943. Dep: 23/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2276 (Diagram 56) |
||
18/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/08/1944. Dep: 07/09/1944. | ||
25/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3287 | ||
25/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1947. Dep: 20/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3127 (Diagram 56B) |
||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63287 but not taken up | ||
11/1950 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
29/11/1950 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3287 from Borough Gardens (54C) |