|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1916 | 04/1916 | General | |||||
1921 | 09/1921 | General | |||||
Darlington Works | 30/08/1924 | 11/11/1924 | 74 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/06/1928 | 24/08/1928 | 61 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/06/1931 | 12/09/1931 | 101 days | General | Boiler number D1403 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/08/1936 | 18/09/1936 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D1382 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/03/1939 | 04/05/1939 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 2229 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/04/1941 | 19/06/1941 | 53 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1941 | 19/07/1941 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/06/1943 | 16/08/1943 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 2889 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Gateshead Works | 19/11/1945 | 01/12/1945 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 30/01/1946 | 01/03/1946 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 11/12/1946 | 01/02/1947 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 3126 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/02/1947 | 10/02/1947 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/01/1949 | 03/01/1949 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1949 | Darlington Works (To scrap yard) | Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). | SLS/194904 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1903 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1669 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 1 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
07/04/1916 | Modification | Diagram 56 number D538 boiler fitted | ||
30/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1924. Dep: 11/11/1924. | ||
25/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1928. Dep: 24/08/1928. | ||
04/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1931. Dep: 12/09/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1403 (Diagram 56) |
||
13/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1936. Dep: 18/09/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1382 (Diagram 56) |
||
06/02/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
15/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1939. Dep: 04/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2229 (Diagram 56) |
||
28/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1941. Dep: 19/06/1941. | ||
09/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/07/1941. Dep: 19/07/1941. | ||
12/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1943. Dep: 16/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2889 (Diagram 56B) |
||
20/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
19/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/11/1945. Dep: 01/12/1945. | ||
20/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3291 | ||
30/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/01/1946. Dep: 01/03/1946. | ||
11/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1946. Dep: 01/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3126 (Diagram 56B) |
||
05/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/02/1947. Dep: 10/02/1947. | ||
02/11/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63291 but not taken up | ||
03/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 03/01/1949. Dep: 03/01/1949. | ||
02/1949 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
12/02/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3291 from Middlesbrough (MID) |