|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/1911 | 07/03/1911 | General | |||||
1915 | 03/1915 | General | Boiler number D2101 (Diagram 56) |
||||
1916 | 08/1916 | General | Boiler number D1919 (Diagram 56) |
||||
1922 | 12/1922 | General | Boiler number D24 (Diagram 56) |
||||
Darlington Works | 13/02/1925 | 30/04/1925 | 77 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/11/1927 | 16/03/1928 | 128 days | General | Boiler number D2068 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/11/1928 | 29/11/1928 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/11/1930 | 23/12/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1934 | 05/07/1934 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2271 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/08/1934 | 07/09/1934 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/06/1937 | 29/07/1937 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 2086 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/01/1940 | 14/02/1940 | 42 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/09/1940 | 15/10/1940 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2794 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/09/1942 | 29/10/1942 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 3249 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/03/1944 | 20/04/1944 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 2909 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Gateshead Works | 21/12/1945 | 10/01/1946 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1947 | 07/06/1947 | 78 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/06/1947 | 21/06/1947 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1949 | 31/10/1949 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1904 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 443 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 4 Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
03/1911 | Modification | Diagram 56 number G287 boiler fitted | ||
10/10/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
07/02/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
13/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1925. Dep: 30/04/1925. | ||
10/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1927. Dep: 16/03/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2068 (Diagram 56) |
||
12/03/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thirsk (TSK) | ||
19/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/11/1928. Dep: 29/11/1928. | ||
01/08/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shildon (SHI) | ||
04/11/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kirkby Stephen (KBY) | ||
18/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1930. Dep: 23/12/1930. | ||
06/01/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shildon (SHI) | ||
05/10/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ferryhill (Co. Durham) (FER) | ||
31/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1934. Dep: 05/07/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2271 (Diagram 56) |
||
21/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/08/1934. Dep: 07/09/1934. | ||
14/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1937. Dep: 29/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2086 (Diagram 56) |
||
07/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
02/08/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
04/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/01/1940. Dep: 14/02/1940. | ||
13/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1940. Dep: 15/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2794 (Diagram 56B) |
||
22/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1942. Dep: 29/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3249 (Diagram 56B) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
25/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1944. Dep: 20/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2909 (Diagram 56B) |
||
21/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/12/1945. Dep: 10/01/1946. | ||
01/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3294 | ||
22/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1947. Dep: 07/06/1947. | ||
10/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/06/1947. Dep: 21/06/1947. | ||
27/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
03/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63294 but not taken up | ||
31/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 31/10/1949. Dep: 31/10/1949. | ||
11/1949 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
03/11/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3294 from Selby (SEL) |