|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1916 | 07/1916 | General | |||||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1924 | 30/08/1924 | 92 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1927 | 29/02/1928 | 77 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/01/1931 | 11/02/1931 | 34 days | General | Boiler number D601 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/05/1935 | 12/06/1935 | 43 days | General | Boiler number D615 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/10/1938 | 22/11/1938 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 2270 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/01/1941 | 27/02/1941 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2227 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/10/1942 | 04/12/1942 | 38 days | General | Boiler number D1470 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/04/1945 | 11/06/1945 | 53 days | General | Boiler number D1400 (Diagram 56) |
||
Gateshead Works | 02/11/1946 | 07/11/1946 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 06/05/1947 | 09/05/1947 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 29/01/1948 | 29/01/1948 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/02/1948 | Darlington Works | New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) | SLS/194804 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1904 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1150 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 9 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
07/07/1916 | Modification | Diagram 56 number D572 boiler fitted | ||
31/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1924. Dep: 30/08/1924. | ||
15/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1927. Dep: 29/02/1928. | ||
09/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1931. Dep: 11/02/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D601 (Diagram 56) |
||
01/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1935. Dep: 12/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D615 (Diagram 56) |
||
14/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1938. Dep: 22/11/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2270 (Diagram 56) |
||
28/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1941. Dep: 27/02/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2227 (Diagram 56) |
||
28/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1942. Dep: 04/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1470 (Diagram 56) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
20/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1945. Dep: 11/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1400 (Diagram 56) |
||
20/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3298 | ||
02/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/11/1946. Dep: 07/11/1946. | ||
06/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/05/1947. Dep: 09/05/1947. | ||
29/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 29/01/1948. Dep: 29/01/1948. | ||
02/1948 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
27/02/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3298 from Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63298 but not taken up |