|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1920 | 04/1920 | General | Boiler number D1052 (Diagram 56) |
||||
Gateshead Works | 06/06/1923 | 17/08/1923 | 73 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/06/1927 | 12/10/1927 | 115 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/03/1930 | 06/05/1930 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1932 | 05/01/1933 | 31 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 12/04/1934 | 10/05/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number D1457 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/09/1937 | 07/10/1937 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2271 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/07/1940 | 26/07/1940 | 25 days | General | Boiler number D1745 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1943 | 04/03/1943 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2150 (Diagram 56) |
||
Gateshead Works | 27/09/1944 | 17/10/1944 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 10/04/1946 | 11/05/1946 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2272 (Diagram 56) |
||
Gateshead Works | 16/08/1947 | 05/09/1947 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 04/01/1949 | 04/01/1949 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1949 | Darlington Works (To scrap yard) | Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). | SLS/194904 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1904 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1173 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 10 Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
06/06/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1923. Dep: 17/08/1923. | ||
07/02/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
20/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1927. Dep: 12/10/1927. | ||
24/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1930. Dep: 06/05/1930. | ||
25/06/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
06/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/12/1932. Dep: 05/01/1933. | ||
12/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1934. Dep: 10/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1457 (Diagram 56) |
||
02/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1937. Dep: 07/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2271 (Diagram 56) |
||
02/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1940. Dep: 26/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1745 (Diagram 56) |
||
02/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1943. Dep: 04/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2150 (Diagram 56) |
||
27/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/09/1944. Dep: 17/10/1944. | ||
20/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3299 | ||
10/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1946. Dep: 11/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2272 (Diagram 56) |
||
16/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/08/1947. Dep: 05/09/1947. | ||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63299 but not taken up | ||
04/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 04/01/1949. Dep: 04/01/1949. | ||
02/1949 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
12/02/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3299 from Haverton Hill (HAV) |