|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1914 | 06/1914 | General | Boiler number G116 (Diagram 56) |
||||
1917 | 05/1917 | General | Boiler number D1927 (Diagram 56) |
||||
Darlington Works | 20/11/1923 | 11/03/1924 | 113 days | General | Boiler number D1453 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/02/1927 | 14/05/1927 | 97 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/04/1929 | 14/06/1929 | 59 days | General | Boiler number D1023 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/03/1930 | 16/04/1930 | 24 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/07/1932 | 16/08/1932 | 36 days | General | Boiler number D989 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/03/1935 | 03/07/1935 | 100 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/10/1937 | 03/12/1937 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 2889 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/12/1938 | 05/01/1939 | 29 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1939 | 30/03/1940 | 110 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1940 | 18/09/1940 | 38 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 19/04/1943 | 22/05/1943 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2929 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Gateshead Works | 10/08/1944 | 24/08/1944 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/09/1946 | 02/11/1946 | 39 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1949 | Darlington Works (scrap yard) | New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. | SLS/194907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1901 | Modification | Diagram 56 number 3384 boiler fitted | ||
06/1907 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 578 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 516 Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
20/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1923. Dep: 11/03/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1453 (Diagram 56) |
||
22/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
07/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1927. Dep: 14/05/1927. | ||
17/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1929. Dep: 14/06/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1023 (Diagram 56) |
||
24/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/03/1930. Dep: 16/04/1930. | ||
12/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1932. Dep: 16/08/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D989 (Diagram 56) |
||
26/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1935. Dep: 03/07/1935. | ||
20/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1937. Dep: 03/12/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2889 (Diagram 56B) |
||
05/02/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
08/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/12/1938. Dep: 05/01/1939. | ||
12/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/12/1939. Dep: 30/03/1940. | ||
12/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1940. Dep: 18/09/1940. | ||
21/11/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
19/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1943. Dep: 22/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2929 (Diagram 56B) |
||
10/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/08/1944. Dep: 24/08/1944. | ||
22/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
25/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1946. Dep: 02/11/1946. | ||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3300 | ||
20/07/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
05/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
10/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
30/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
05/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63300 but not taken up | ||
16/05/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3300 from Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
06/1949 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |