|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1915 | 12/1915 | General | |||||
1922 | 11/1922 | General | |||||
Darlington Works | 13/01/1927 | 20/04/1927 | 98 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/11/1930 | 12/12/1930 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2233 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/05/1934 | 28/05/1934 | 27 days | General | Rebuilt to class Q5/2 Boiler number D1704 (Diagram 56A) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/12/1936 | 01/02/1937 | 43 days | General | Boiler number D1994 (Diagram 56A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/02/1940 | 13/04/1940 | 47 days | General | Boiler number D1815 (Diagram 56A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/04/1940 | 20/04/1940 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/02/1942 | 06/03/1942 | 23 days | General | Boiler number D1670 (Diagram 56A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/04/1943 | 31/05/1943 | 35 days | General | Rebuilt to class Q5/1 Boiler number 3371 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Gateshead Works | 24/06/1945 | 09/07/1945 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 20/08/1947 | 20/08/1947 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1907 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 939 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 518 Allocated to Shildon (SHI) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
07/12/1915 | Modification | Diagram 56 number D14 boiler fitted | ||
13/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1927. Dep: 20/04/1927. | ||
04/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1930. Dep: 12/12/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2233 (Diagram 56) |
||
02/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1934. Dep: 28/05/1934. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class Q5/2 Boiler number D1704 (Diagram 56A) |
||
07/01/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
21/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1936. Dep: 01/02/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1994 (Diagram 56A) |
||
27/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1940. Dep: 13/04/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1815 (Diagram 56A) |
||
16/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/04/1940. Dep: 20/04/1940. | ||
12/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1942. Dep: 06/03/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1670 (Diagram 56A) |
||
27/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1943. Dep: 31/05/1943. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class Q5/1 Boiler number 3371 (Diagram 56B) |
||
24/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/06/1945. Dep: 09/07/1945. | ||
23/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3302 | ||
20/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 20/08/1947. Dep: 20/08/1947. | ||
18/09/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3302 from Blaydon (BLA) |