|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1912 | 10/1912 | General | Boiler number D1927 (Diagram 56) |
||||
1917 | 05/1917 | General | |||||
1922 | 22/12/1922 | General | |||||
Gateshead Works | 24/01/1925 | 03/04/1925 | 70 days | General | Boiler number D1457 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/03/1930 | 29/04/1930 | 51 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/04/1934 | 28/04/1934 | 25 days | General | Rebuilt to class Q5/2 Boiler number D1674 (Diagram 56A) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/06/1937 | 15/07/1937 | 45 days | General | Boiler number D1805 (Diagram 56A) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/07/1938 | 23/08/1938 | 29 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 23/12/1938 | 31/12/1938 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/06/1940 | 13/07/1940 | 27 days | General | Boiler number D1994 (Diagram 56A) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1942 | 29/12/1942 | 37 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 03/01/1945 | 14/02/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 23/04/1946 | 06/05/1946 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1946 | 18/12/1946 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1947 | 15/03/1947 | 50 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 27/03/1947 | 01/04/1947 | 6 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1949 | Darlington Works (scrap yard) | New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. | SLS/194907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1907 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1054 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 521 Allocated to Blyth (North) (NBH) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
07/05/1917 | Modification | Diagram 56 number D1915 boiler fitted | ||
24/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1925. Dep: 03/04/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1457 (Diagram 56) |
||
05/06/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shildon (SHI) | ||
10/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1930. Dep: 29/04/1930. | ||
04/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1934. Dep: 28/04/1934. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class Q5/2 Boiler number D1674 (Diagram 56A) |
||
07/01/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
01/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1937. Dep: 15/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1805 (Diagram 56A) |
||
26/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 26/07/1938. Dep: 23/08/1938. | ||
23/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/12/1938. Dep: 31/12/1938. | ||
17/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1940. Dep: 13/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1994 (Diagram 56A) |
||
23/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1942. Dep: 29/12/1942. | ||
08/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
03/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1945. Dep: 14/02/1945. | ||
20/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3305 | ||
23/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/04/1946. Dep: 06/05/1946. | ||
23/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/11/1946. Dep: 18/12/1946. | ||
25/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1947. Dep: 15/03/1947. | ||
27/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/03/1947. Dep: 01/04/1947. | ||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63305 but not taken up | ||
16/05/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3305 from Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
06/1949 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |