|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1912 | 10/1912 | General | Boiler number D1931 (Diagram 56) |
||||
Gateshead Works | 1922 | 14/09/1922 | General | ||||
Gateshead Works | 08/06/1926 | 10/09/1926 | 95 days | General | Boiler number D1757 (Diagram 56) |
||
Gateshead Works | 14/03/1930 | 29/04/1930 | 47 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 19/02/1931 | 24/03/1931 | 34 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 11/04/1934 | 08/05/1934 | 28 days | General | Rebuilt to class Q5/2 Boiler number D1988 (Diagram 56A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/08/1937 | 22/09/1937 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D1674 (Diagram 56A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1940 | 23/07/1940 | 27 days | General | Boiler number D1805 (Diagram 56A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/01/1941 | 14/02/1941 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 27/07/1942 | 06/08/1942 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/08/1942 | 10/09/1942 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 24/05/1943 | 30/06/1943 | 38 days | General | Boiler number D1670 (Diagram 56A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/11/1945 | 11/12/1945 | 28 days | General | Rebuilt to class Q5/1 Boiler number 3602 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Gateshead Works | 19/02/1947 | 28/02/1947 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 21/05/1948 | 21/05/1948 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1907 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 644 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 526 Allocated to Blyth (North) (NBH) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: ?/1922. Dep: 14/09/1922. | ||
08/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1926. Dep: 10/09/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1757 (Diagram 56) |
||
14/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1930. Dep: 29/04/1930. | ||
19/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/02/1931. Dep: 24/03/1931. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
11/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1934. Dep: 08/05/1934. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class Q5/2 Boiler number D1988 (Diagram 56A) |
||
17/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1937. Dep: 22/09/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1674 (Diagram 56A) |
||
27/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1940. Dep: 23/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1805 (Diagram 56A) |
||
27/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/01/1941. Dep: 14/02/1941. | ||
27/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/07/1942. Dep: 06/08/1942. | ||
25/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/08/1942. Dep: 10/09/1942. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
24/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1943. Dep: 30/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1670 (Diagram 56A) |
||
22/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
14/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1945. Dep: 11/12/1945. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class Q5/1 Boiler number 3602 (Diagram 56B) |
||
14/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3310 | ||
19/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/02/1947. Dep: 28/02/1947. | ||
21/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 21/05/1948. Dep: 21/05/1948. | ||
06/1948 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
11/06/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3310 from Selby (SEL) | ||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63310 but not taken up |