|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/1913 | General | ||||||
10/1915 | General | ||||||
Gateshead Works | 24/08/1923 | 22/11/1923 | 91 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/04/1927 | 12/07/1927 | 82 days | General | Boiler number D1955 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/11/1930 | 19/12/1930 | 46 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 23/05/1934 | 28/06/1934 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D1470 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/05/1936 | 21/05/1936 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/03/1937 | 23/04/1937 | 37 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 12/02/1940 | 15/03/1940 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 3120 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/09/1942 | 24/10/1942 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 3240 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Gateshead Works | 19/09/1944 | 07/10/1944 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 20/07/1946 | 31/08/1946 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3615 (Diagram 56B) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3318 |
||
Gateshead Works | 08/12/1947 | 24/12/1947 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 22/06/1949 | 22/06/1949 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1908 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 655 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 534 Allocated to Annfield Plain (AFP) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
01/1913 | Modification | Diagram 56 number D1925 boiler fitted | ||
10/1915 | Modification | Diagram 56 number D1933 boiler fitted | ||
24/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1923. Dep: 22/11/1923. | ||
01/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
09/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shildon (SHI) | ||
22/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1927. Dep: 12/07/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1955 (Diagram 56) |
||
04/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1930. Dep: 19/12/1930. | ||
23/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1934. Dep: 28/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1470 (Diagram 56) |
||
07/01/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
12/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/05/1936. Dep: 21/05/1936. | ||
18/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1937. Dep: 23/04/1937. | ||
12/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1940. Dep: 15/03/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3120 (Diagram 56B) |
||
25/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1942. Dep: 24/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3240 (Diagram 56B) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
19/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/09/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944. | ||
20/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1946. Dep: 31/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3615 (Diagram 56B) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3318 |
||
20/07/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
08/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/12/1947. Dep: 24/12/1947. | ||
05/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
11/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63318 but not taken up | ||
1949 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
22/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 22/06/1949. Dep: 22/06/1949. | ||
27/06/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3318 from Middlesbrough (MID) |