Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 30 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1702 Week
» 20023 Month
» 108215 Year
» 992596 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NER 642 m/e 06/1911
LNER (1946) 3320   25/08/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Worsdell
Class Q5
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q5/106/1911
Q5/215/06/1933
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number 411A
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 06/1911 to Shildon (SHI)
Withdrawal Sat 22/03/1947 off Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 35 yrs, 9 mths , 19 dys
Information Slide valves

Notes
Notes Cut up at BRW07

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SHI Shildon (New) m/e 06/1911
NPT Newport (Teeside) 07/01/1935
SKN Stockton 16/10/1939
NPT Newport (Teeside) 01/02/1943
BOR Borough Gardens 28/03/1943
   Withdrawn 22/03/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN HLB Hull Botanic Gardens 22/03/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1911 Diagram 56 boiler fitted (number G949)
05/12/1929 Diagram 56 boiler fitted (number 2232)
15/06/1933 Diagram 56A boiler fitted (number D1817)
04/07/1936 Diagram 56A boiler fitted (number D1815)
14/03/1940 Diagram 56A boiler fitted (number D1809)
18/12/1942 Diagram 56A boiler fitted (number D1704)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 04/05/1925 31/08/1925 120 days General  
Darlington Works 21/10/1929 05/12/1929 46 days General
Boiler number 2232 (Diagram 56)
 
Darlington Works 09/05/1933 15/06/1933 38 days General
Rebuilt to class Q5/2
Boiler number D1817 (Diagram 56A)
 
Darlington Works 09/08/1934 16/08/1934 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 02/06/1936 04/07/1936 33 days General
Boiler number D1815 (Diagram 56A)
 
Darlington Works 09/02/1940 14/03/1940 35 days General
Boiler number D1809 (Diagram 56A)
 
Darlington Works 13/06/1940 13/06/1940 1 day Unclassified  
Darlington Works 28/06/1940 28/06/1940 1 day Unclassified  
Darlington Works 12/08/1940 26/09/1940 46 days General  
Darlington Works 10/11/1942 18/12/1942 39 days General
Boiler number D1704 (Diagram 56A)
 
Gateshead Works 08/08/1944 30/08/1944 23 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 04/01/1947 04/01/1947 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1911 To Service To service as NER Number 642
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Shildon (SHI)
Diagram 56 boiler fitted
   
1922 Works Visit Works Visit - (General) - Arr: ?/1922. Dep: ?/04/1922.    
04/05/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1925. Dep: 31/08/1925.    
21/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1929. Dep: 05/12/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2232 (Diagram 56)
   
09/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1933. Dep: 15/06/1933.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class Q5/2
Boiler number D1817 (Diagram 56A)
   
09/08/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/08/1934. Dep: 16/08/1934.    
07/01/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
02/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1936. Dep: 04/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1815 (Diagram 56A)
   
16/10/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (SKN)    
09/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1940. Dep: 14/03/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1809 (Diagram 56A)
   
13/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/06/1940. Dep: 13/06/1940.    
28/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/06/1940. Dep: 28/06/1940.    
12/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1940. Dep: 26/09/1940.    
10/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1942. Dep: 18/12/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1704 (Diagram 56A)
   
01/02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR)    
08/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/08/1944. Dep: 30/08/1944.    
25/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3320    
04/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 04/01/1947. Dep: 04/01/1947.    
22/03/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 3320 from Borough Gardens (BOR)    

prev prev