|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1915 | 08/1915 | General | |||||
1916 | 12/1916 | General | Boiler number D615 (Diagram 56) |
||||
Darlington Works | 21/02/1924 | 02/05/1924 | 72 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 26/07/1927 | 16/11/1927 | 114 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 24/10/1930 | 01/12/1930 | 39 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 20/10/1931 | 27/10/1931 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/03/1935 | 08/04/1935 | 36 days | General | Boiler number D854 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/06/1939 | 03/08/1939 | 39 days | General | Boiler number D1382 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/04/1942 | 16/05/1942 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 3228 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/06/1945 | 07/07/1945 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 3121 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Gateshead Works | 02/08/1946 | 12/08/1946 | 11 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3326 |
||
Darlington Works | 11/02/1948 | 19/03/1948 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 3132 (Diagram 56B) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3326 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/09/1947 | WD | The Italian State Railways have commenced renumbering the W.D. and U.S.A. locomotives they took over in 1946. Three classes have so far had new numbers allocated to them. The W.D. 2-8-2 Nos. 71016/28/37/8/40/83/4/5/7/9/95/7/8/1100/6/9/10/3/4/9/20/46/8/51/7/66/7/89/91/3, are to become 747.001 to 747.030. No. 71027 taken over in 1946 has apparently been withdrawn. The USA. 2-8-0 Nos. 1650/75/93/6, 1711/6/8/32/4/7/40/1/7/52/3/61/5/7/74/5/82, 1783/5/99, 1851/2/7/8/60/5/6/8/70, 2059/60/6/7/8/9/70/8/9/80/1, 2736-50, 2766-75, 3275-8, 3283-3320, 3322-6, 3328/9/32/4/5/6/7/9/42/8/50, 3380-96, 3405-8, 3411-28, 3430, 3562/8/9/70/1/2, 3611/7/8/9/22/3/40/1, 3660-71, 3685-99, 4418/21/37, 5701/2/31/5/6, 5740-58, 5760/1, 5825/9/34, 5835/44/5, are to become 736.001 to 736.243. Of these up to No. 2081 saw previous service in Algeria and Tunisia. The rest were shipped direct from the U.S.A. to Naples. No. 4418 was noted as Alco. 73410 of 1945. U.S.A. 0-6-OT Nos. 1927/9/30/1 are to become 831.001 to 831.004. No. 1928 has been withdrawn or sold. No mention has yet been made of the renumbering of the Stanier 2-8-0, but it seems more than likely that they will become Nos. 737.001 to 737.015. | SLS/194711 |
30/06/1951 | Locomotives still not renumbered | Although it is well over three years since the B.R. renumbering scheme was introduced, there were several classes with a small percentage still not renumbered (or at any rate not advised as done) at the end of June-Class B16 (69 survivors): Nos. 1419/23/33. Class D20 (28 survivors): Nos. 2360/72/95. Class Q5 (4 survivors): Nos. 3270, 3311/4/26. Of this large class, only 9 received B.R. numbers, the last to be done being 63313(2/12/48). None of the renumbered engines survives. Class Q6 is completely renumbered, No. 63342 having just been done. Class Q7 (15 engines): all done except. No. 3460. Class J21 (37 survivors): all done except 5025, 5117/22. Class J24 (6 survivors): not renumbered are 5623 (Scotland) and 5644. Class J25 (57 survivors): all done except 5663/7/86, 5727. (5699 has become 65699 but no trace of advice). Class J26 was completed on 19/5/51 when 65769 was done. Class J27 (115 engines): all done except 5890/4. Class G5 (106 survivors): all renumbered by 31/3/51. Class J71 (76 survivors): twelve to be done, Nos. 8230/1/9/47/9/51/4/72/98, 8304/11/6-an unusually large percentage not dealt with. Class J77 (38 survivors): Nos. 8405/38 not renumbered. Class J72 (113 engines): to be renumbered 8672/81, 8730(?), 8748. Class N10 (19 survivors): all done (?except 9095). | SLS/195108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1911 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 669 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
07/08/1915 | Modification | Diagram 56 number G294 boiler fitted | ||
21/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1924. Dep: 02/05/1924. | ||
24/05/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
26/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1927. Dep: 16/11/1927. | ||
24/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1930. Dep: 01/12/1930. | ||
20/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/10/1931. Dep: 27/10/1931. | ||
04/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1935. Dep: 08/04/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D854 (Diagram 56) |
||
08/06/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
24/06/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
26/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1939. Dep: 03/08/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1382 (Diagram 56) |
||
01/03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
23/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1942. Dep: 16/05/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3228 (Diagram 56B) |
||
19/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
12/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1945. Dep: 07/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3121 (Diagram 56B) |
||
02/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/08/1946. Dep: 12/08/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3326 |
||
13/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
11/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1948. Dep: 19/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3132 (Diagram 56B) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3326 |
||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63326 but not taken up | ||
06/10/1951 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3326 from Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
11/1951 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |