|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 06/07/1923 | 13/09/1923 | 70 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 12/05/1925 | 02/06/1925 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 09/11/1928 | 30/03/1928 | -223 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/11/1932 | 30/11/1932 | 30 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/10/1935 | 28/11/1935 | 58 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/01/1939 | 13/02/1939 | 35 days | General | Boiler number D1441 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/07/1941 | 29/08/1941 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/11/1942 | 26/11/1942 | 25 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/09/1943 | 12/10/1943 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 2229 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/07/1945 | 19/07/1945 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 24/02/1947 | 12/04/1947 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 3116 (Diagram 56B) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1911 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 770 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Blyth (North) (NBH) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
06/07/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1923. Dep: 13/09/1923. | ||
12/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/05/1925. Dep: 02/06/1925. | ||
30/03/1928 | Modification | Diagram 56 number D2080 boiler fitted | ||
09/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1928. Dep: 30/03/1928. | ||
23/04/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
01/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1932. Dep: 30/11/1932. | ||
25/01/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
02/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1935. Dep: 28/11/1935. | ||
10/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1939. Dep: 13/02/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1441 (Diagram 56) |
||
17/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1941. Dep: 29/08/1941. | ||
02/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/11/1942. Dep: 26/11/1942. | ||
18/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1943. Dep: 12/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2229 (Diagram 56) |
||
04/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/07/1945. Dep: 19/07/1945. | ||
18/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3330 | ||
20/01/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
24/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1947. Dep: 12/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3116 (Diagram 56B) |
||
02/11/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63330 but not taken up | ||
28/12/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3330 from Darlington (DAR) | ||
01/1950 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |