Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 289 Today
» 752 Yesterday
» 3528 Week
» 16041 Month
» 104233 Year
» 988614 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NER 771   09/1911
LNER (1946) 3331   27/01/1946
BR 63331   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Worsdell
Class Q5
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q5/109/1911
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number 411A
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 09/1911 to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)
Withdrawal Sat 12/02/1949 off Haverton Hill (HAV)
Scrapping During 02/1949 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 37 yrs, 5 mths , 12 dys
Information Slide valves

Notes
Notes Cut up at BRW07

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) 09/1911
MAR March 22/10/1931
HLD Hull Dairycoates 05/02/1932
NPT Newport (Teeside) 20/09/1934
MID Middlesbrough 08/01/1944
BLA Blaydon 23/07/1945
HAV Haverton Hill 05/10/1947
   Withdrawn 12/02/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HAV Haverton Hill w/e 11/10/1947
WDN HAV Haverton Hill 07/02/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1911 Diagram 56 boiler fitted (number D17)
07/02/1917 Diagram 56 boiler fitted (number D19)
06/06/1930 Diagram 56 boiler fitted (number 2276)
28/01/1941 Diagram 56 boiler fitted (number 2086)
02/01/1943 Diagram 56 boiler fitted (number 2227)
10/10/1944 Diagram 56 boiler fitted (number 2278)
09/08/1947 Diagram 56B boiler fitted (number 2906)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 23/04/1924 18/07/1924 87 days General  
Darlington Works 22/06/1927 29/09/1927 100 days General  
Darlington Works 17/01/1929 12/02/1929 27 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 05/04/1930 06/06/1930 63 days General
Boiler number 2276 (Diagram 56)
 
Darlington Works 14/03/1935 14/05/1935 62 days General  
Darlington Works 10/02/1938 20/05/1938 100 days General  
Darlington Works 23/12/1940 28/01/1941 37 days General
Boiler number 2086 (Diagram 56)
 
Darlington Works 27/08/1942 12/09/1942 17 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 26/11/1942 02/01/1943 38 days General
Boiler number 2227 (Diagram 56)
 
Darlington Works 12/09/1944 10/10/1944 29 days General
Boiler number 2278 (Diagram 56)
 
Gateshead Works 17/02/1946 01/03/1946 13 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 29/01/1949 29/01/1949 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1911 To Service To service as NER Number 771
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)
Diagram 56 boiler fitted
   
1917 Works Visit Works Visit - (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: ?/02/1917.    
07/02/1917 Modification Diagram 56 number D19 boiler fitted    
23/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1924. Dep: 18/07/1924.    
22/06/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1927. Dep: 29/09/1927.    
17/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/01/1929. Dep: 12/02/1929.    
05/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1930. Dep: 06/06/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2276 (Diagram 56)
   
22/10/1931 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
05/02/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
20/09/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
14/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1935. Dep: 14/05/1935.    
10/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1938. Dep: 20/05/1938.    
23/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1940. Dep: 28/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2086 (Diagram 56)
   
27/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/08/1942. Dep: 12/09/1942.    
26/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1942. Dep: 02/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2227 (Diagram 56)
   
08/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID)    
12/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1944. Dep: 10/10/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2278 (Diagram 56)
   
23/07/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
27/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3331    
17/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/02/1946. Dep: 01/03/1946.    
09/08/1947 Modification Diagram 56B number 2906 boiler fitted    
05/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 63331 but not taken up    
29/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 29/01/1949. Dep: 29/01/1949.    
02/1949 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    
12/02/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 3331 from Haverton Hill (HAV)    

prev prev