|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 21/04/1924 | 28/06/1924 | 69 days | General | Boiler number D2098 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1926 | 11/02/1927 | 93 days | General | Boiler number D1768 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/09/1929 | 22/10/1929 | 51 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 21/04/1931 | 05/05/1931 | 15 days | Heavy | Boiler number D572 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1935 | 27/02/1935 | 28 days | General | Boiler number D856 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/08/1939 | 14/02/1940 | 198 days | General | Boiler number 3116 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/04/1940 | 25/04/1940 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/03/1942 | 09/04/1942 | 34 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 18/12/1943 | 19/01/1944 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/12/1944 | 02/02/1945 | 44 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1946 | 24/08/1946 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 2811 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Gateshead Works | 16/09/1947 | 01/10/1947 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/08/1948 | 17/09/1948 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 3233 (Diagram 56B) Renumbered to BR 63333 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
03/10/1948 | Darlington Works | The first new 'A.1,' No. 60130, was on trial W/E 24/9 and No. 60131 during W/E 2/10, both are nameless. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 517, 2342/71, 3344, 5027/28, 5852/83, 7300/07, 8141, E8723, 9392, 9881, 61638, 63099, 69841 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60804, 60980, 62729/75, 63333/91, 65666/92, 65752, 68302/99, 68675, 68744, 69868 and 'Austerity' 77050. No. 9089 was broken up W/E 24/9. | SLS/194811 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1911 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 773 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
21/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1924. Dep: 28/06/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2098 (Diagram 56) |
||
11/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1926. Dep: 11/02/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1768 (Diagram 56) |
||
02/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1929. Dep: 22/10/1929. | ||
21/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 21/04/1931. Dep: 05/05/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D572 (Diagram 56) |
||
15/12/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
19/02/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
31/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1935. Dep: 27/02/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D856 (Diagram 56) |
||
22/11/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
01/04/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ferryhill (Co. Durham) (FER) | ||
07/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
29/07/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
01/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1939. Dep: 14/02/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3116 (Diagram 56B) |
||
11/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/04/1940. Dep: 25/04/1940. | ||
07/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1942. Dep: 09/04/1942. | ||
18/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1943. Dep: 19/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 56B) |
||
21/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/12/1944. Dep: 02/02/1945. | ||
30/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3333 | ||
10/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1946. Dep: 24/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2811 (Diagram 56B) |
||
16/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/09/1947. Dep: 01/10/1947. | ||
25/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1948. Dep: 17/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3233 (Diagram 56B) Renumbered to BR 63333 |
||
21/12/1950 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63333 from Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
02/1951 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |