|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1922 | 10/1922 | General | Boiler number D1921 (Diagram 56) |
||||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1925 | 30/09/1925 | 85 days | General | Boiler number D1485 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/07/1929 | 16/08/1929 | 47 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 31/08/1931 | 28/09/1931 | 29 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1933 | 23/03/1933 | 43 days | General | Boiler number D1006 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/05/1936 | 01/07/1936 | 41 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/07/1936 | 27/07/1936 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/10/1937 | 10/11/1937 | 31 days | Heavy | Boiler number 2233 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/11/1939 | 18/12/1939 | 43 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1940 | 13/09/1940 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/09/1942 | 10/11/1942 | 53 days | General | Boiler number D1365 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/08/1944 | 18/09/1944 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 01/10/1944 | 22/10/1944 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 13/01/1948 | 05/02/1948 | 24 days | Light Repair |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1949 | Darlington Works (scrap yard) | New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. | SLS/194907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1911 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 774 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Shildon (SHI) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
08/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1925. Dep: 30/09/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1485 (Diagram 56) |
||
01/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1929. Dep: 16/08/1929. | ||
31/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 31/08/1931. Dep: 28/09/1931. | ||
09/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1933. Dep: 23/03/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1006 (Diagram 56) |
||
07/01/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
22/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1936. Dep: 01/07/1936. | ||
06/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/07/1936. Dep: 27/07/1936. | ||
11/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 11/10/1937. Dep: 10/11/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2233 (Diagram 56) |
||
06/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1939. Dep: 18/12/1939. | ||
06/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/09/1940. Dep: 13/09/1940. | ||
19/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1942. Dep: 10/11/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1365 (Diagram 56) |
||
29/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/08/1944. Dep: 18/09/1944. | ||
01/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/10/1944. Dep: 22/10/1944. | ||
14/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3334 | ||
17/08/1946 | Modification | Diagram 56 number 2150 boiler fitted | ||
13/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/01/1948. Dep: 05/02/1948. | ||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63334 but not taken up | ||
05/1949 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
16/05/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3334 from Darlington (DAR) |