|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1915 | 01/1915 | General | |||||
1917 | 05/1917 | General | Boiler number D17 (Diagram 56) |
||||
Gateshead Works | 08/12/1924 | 19/02/1925 | 74 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 05/07/1928 | 17/09/1928 | 75 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/07/1930 | 26/08/1930 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2278 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/09/1931 | 23/10/1931 | 33 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 27/11/1934 | 04/01/1935 | 39 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/04/1936 | 02/06/1936 | 56 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 11/04/1938 | 19/05/1938 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2914 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/01/1939 | 14/02/1939 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/12/1940 | 15/02/1941 | 48 days | General | Tender only Boiler number 2906 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/12/1943 | 21/01/1944 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2916 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Gateshead Works | 11/10/1945 | 30/10/1945 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1947 | 29/03/1947 | 58 days | General |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1911 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 781 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Shildon (SHI) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
07/01/1915 | Modification | Diagram 56 number G295 boiler fitted | ||
08/12/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1924. Dep: 19/02/1925. | ||
05/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1928. Dep: 17/09/1928. | ||
28/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1930. Dep: 26/08/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2278 (Diagram 56) |
||
21/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1931. Dep: 23/10/1931. | ||
27/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1934. Dep: 04/01/1935. | ||
20/03/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
08/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/04/1936. Dep: 02/06/1936. | ||
11/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1938. Dep: 19/05/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2914 (Diagram 56B) |
||
26/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/01/1939. Dep: 14/02/1939. | ||
30/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1940. Dep: 15/02/1941. Work undertaken: Tender only Boiler number 2906 (Diagram 56B) |
||
22/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1943. Dep: 21/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2916 (Diagram 56B) |
||
11/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/10/1945. Dep: 30/10/1945. | ||
08/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3335 | ||
31/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1947. Dep: 29/03/1947. | ||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63335 but not taken up | ||
1949 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
29/08/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3335 from Darlington (DAR) |