Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 165 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 165 Week
» 39211 Month
» 413224 Year
» 1634789 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1249 m/e 02/1913
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3342   07/04/1946
British Railways (BR Tmp) E3342   05/03/1948
British Railways 63342 w/e 16/06/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class Q6
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q602/1913
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number 441A
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 02/1913 to Hull Springhead (HLS)
Withdrawal Wed 04/12/1963 off Sunderland (52G)
Service Life 50 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 20/12/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLS Hull Springhead (New) m/e 02/1913
NPT Newport (Teeside) on 23/05/1924
BOR Borough Gardens on 04/12/1943
52K Consett on 14/06/1959
52G Sunderland on 06/05/1962
   Withdrawn on 04/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 54D Consett on 14/06/1959
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 02/06/1962
WDN   on 04/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1913 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D167)
07/1921 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D201)
19/09/1929 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2261)
01/08/1934 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D1941)
30/10/1936 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2561)
09/09/1939 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2565)
21/09/1945 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2155)
05/03/1948 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2876)
16/06/1951 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 24180)
25/02/1954 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 24151)
03/05/1957 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24204)
13/04/1960 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24306)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 1921 07/1921   General
Boiler number D201 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 18/07/1923 12/10/1923 87 days General  
Darlington Works 29/01/1926 22/06/1926 145 days General  
Darlington Works 30/07/1929 19/09/1929 52 days General
Boiler number 2261 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 21/04/1932 23/05/1932 33 days General  
Darlington Works 20/06/1934 01/08/1934 43 days General
Boiler number D1941 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 16/09/1936 30/10/1936 45 days General
Boiler number 2561 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 08/08/1939 09/09/1939 33 days General
Boiler number 2565 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 24/02/1942 13/03/1942 18 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 28/05/1942 06/07/1942 40 days General  
Gateshead Works 19/05/1944 16/06/1944 29 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 22/08/1945 21/09/1945 31 days General
Boiler number 2155 (Diagram 50)
 
Gateshead Works 03/12/1946 14/12/1946 12 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 10/02/1948 05/03/1948 25 days General
Boiler number 2876 (Diagram 50)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3342
 
Darlington Works 15/03/1948 22/03/1948 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 25/05/1951 16/06/1951 23 days General
Boiler number 24180 (Diagram 50)
Renumbered to BR 63342
 
Darlington Works 29/01/1954 25/02/1954 28 days General
Boiler number 24151 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 05/03/1954 11/03/1954 7 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 07/04/1954 15/04/1954 9 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 08/05/1954 15/05/1954 8 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 01/04/1957 03/05/1957 33 days General
Boiler number 24204 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 11/03/1960 13/04/1960 34 days General
Boiler number 24306 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 26/09/1961 13/11/1961 49 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1947 WD The Italian State Railways have commenced renumbering the W.D. and U.S.A. locomotives they took over in 1946. Three classes have so far had new numbers allocated to them. The W.D. 2-8-2 Nos. 71016/28/37/8/40/83/4/5/7/9/95/7/8/1100/6/9/10/3/4/9/20/46/8/51/7/66/7/89/91/3, are to become 747.001 to 747.030. No. 71027 taken over in 1946 has apparently been withdrawn. The USA. 2-8-0 Nos. 1650/75/93/6, 1711/6/8/32/4/7/40/1/7/52/3/61/5/7/74/5/82, 1783/5/99, 1851/2/7/8/60/5/6/8/70, 2059/60/6/7/8/9/70/8/9/80/1, 2736-50, 2766-75, 3275-8, 3283-3320, 3322-6, 3328/9/32/4/5/6/7/9/42/8/50, 3380-96, 3405-8, 3411-28, 3430, 3562/8/9/70/1/2, 3611/7/8/9/22/3/40/1, 3660-71, 3685-99, 4418/21/37, 5701/2/31/5/6, 5740-58, 5760/1, 5825/9/34, 5835/44/5, are to become 736.001 to 736.243. Of these up to No. 2081 saw previous service in Algeria and Tunisia. The rest were shipped direct from the U.S.A. to Naples. No. 4418 was noted as Alco. 73410 of 1945. U.S.A. 0-6-OT Nos. 1927/9/30/1 are to become 831.001 to 831.004. No. 1928 has been withdrawn or sold. No mention has yet been made of the renumbering of the Stanier 2-8-0, but it seems more than likely that they will become Nos. 737.001 to 737.015. SLS/194711
30/06/1951 Locomotives still not renumbered Although it is well over three years since the B.R. renumbering scheme was introduced, there were several classes with a small percentage still not renumbered (or at any rate not advised as done) at the end of June-Class B16 (69 survivors): Nos. 1419/23/33. Class D20 (28 survivors): Nos. 2360/72/95. Class Q5 (4 survivors): Nos. 3270, 3311/4/26. Of this large class, only 9 received B.R. numbers, the last to be done being 63313(2/12/48). None of the renumbered engines survives. Class Q6 is completely renumbered, No. 63342 having just been done. Class Q7 (15 engines): all done except. No. 3460. Class J21 (37 survivors): all done except 5025, 5117/22. Class J24 (6 survivors): not renumbered are 5623 (Scotland) and 5644. Class J25 (57 survivors): all done except 5663/7/86, 5727. (5699 has become 65699 but no trace of advice). Class J26 was completed on 19/5/51 when 65769 was done. Class J27 (115 engines): all done except 5890/4. Class G5 (106 survivors): all renumbered by 31/3/51. Class J71 (76 survivors): twelve to be done, Nos. 8230/1/9/47/9/51/4/72/98, 8304/11/6-an unusually large percentage not dealt with. Class J77 (38 survivors): Nos. 8405/38 not renumbered. Class J72 (113 engines): to be renumbered 8672/81, 8730(?), 8748. Class N10 (19 survivors): all done (?except 9095). SLS/195108
11/11/1961 Darlington Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1913 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1249
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)
Diagram 50 boiler fitted
   
23/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
04/12/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR)    
07/04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3342    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Consett (52K)    
06/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
04/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63342 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev