|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 1921 | 02/1921 | General | ||||
Darlington Works | 26/03/1925 | 14/08/1925 | 142 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/01/1928 | 29/03/1928 | 66 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 18/11/1930 | 30/12/1930 | 43 days | General | Boiler number E4/22 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/11/1933 | 09/01/1934 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2561 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/08/1936 | 09/10/1936 | 50 days | General | Boiler number HL105 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/12/1938 | 25/01/1939 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2999 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1941 | 04/02/1941 | 28 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 26/10/1943 | 20/11/1943 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 3155 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 25/11/1945 | 13/12/1945 | 19 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 07/03/1947 | 02/05/1947 | 57 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/05/1947 | 13/05/1947 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 24/06/1948 | 06/07/1948 | 13 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63343 |
||
Darlington Works | 06/03/1950 | 14/04/1950 | 40 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 11/08/1952 | 29/08/1952 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 24233 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/10/1954 | 18/11/1954 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 24216 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/04/1957 | 17/05/1957 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24296 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/10/1959 | 27/10/1959 | 6 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 16/11/1960 | 16/12/1960 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24293 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/07/1962 | 09/08/1962 | 35 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/07/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D15, D238, D347, D2232/42, D2701, D3075, D3237, D5112, D4190-2 undercoats, D4193-5 motors fitted to body shells, 43054, 60876, 60955/7, 61018, 63343, 63409/10/26, 68037, 90322, 90622/51, 92061/2. Stripping Shop: 65786, 90008, 90132. Outside Stripping Shop: 63423, 65757. Crossing: D24, D244/6/83, D2604. Diesel Shunter Test House: D4189 painted. Sidings: 60953/62/81, 61010, 63368, 63456, 65099, 65720, 65807, 67634, 67788, 68014, 69026, 90113, 92034. Scrap Yard: 61077 being cut up, 61063, 61265/98, 61415/9/43/50/1, 65693, 65751, 67666, 67753/95 partially dismantled, 61411-3/60, 65695, 65741, 67601/23/60, 67707/47/50/75, 68052, 68707, 69017/97 intact. | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1250 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: ?/1921. Dep: ?/02/1921. | ||
12/01/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
26/03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1925. Dep: 14/08/1925. | ||
25/10/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
24/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1928. Dep: 29/03/1928. | ||
18/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1930. Dep: 30/12/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/22 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1933. Dep: 09/01/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2561 (Diagram 50) |
||
21/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1936. Dep: 09/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL105 (Diagram 50) |
||
14/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1938. Dep: 25/01/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2999 (Diagram 50A) |
||
19/06/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
08/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1941. Dep: 04/02/1941. | ||
26/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1943. Dep: 20/11/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3155 (Diagram 50A) |
||
25/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1945. Dep: 13/12/1945. | ||
14/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3343 | ||
07/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1947. Dep: 02/05/1947. | ||
08/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/05/1947. Dep: 13/05/1947. | ||
24/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/06/1948. Dep: 06/07/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63343 |
||
06/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 06/03/1950. Dep: 14/04/1950. | ||
11/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1952. Dep: 29/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24233 (Diagram 50) |
||
22/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1954. Dep: 18/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24216 (Diagram 50) |
||
10/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (51G) | ||
23/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1957. Dep: 17/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24296 (Diagram 50A) |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
22/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/10/1959. Dep: 27/10/1959. | ||
16/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1960. Dep: 16/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24293 (Diagram 50A) |
||
08/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
06/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/07/1962. Dep: 09/08/1962. | ||
02/02/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
12/04/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
07/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63343 from West Hartlepool (51C) |