|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 23/02/1923 | 23/03/1923 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 12/06/1923 | 20/06/1923 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 26/07/1923 | 07/08/1923 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 07/11/1923 | 21/11/1923 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 03/06/1925 | 18/09/1925 | 108 days | General | Boiler number D212 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 16/10/1928 | 06/12/1928 | 52 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 15/05/1931 | 01/07/1931 | 48 days | General | Boiler number D616 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/11/1934 | 16/02/1935 | 104 days | General | Boiler number D1944 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/09/1937 | 05/01/1938 | 113 days | General | Boiler number 24166 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/04/1940 | 24/04/1940 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/12/1940 | 16/01/1941 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 3157 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/04/1943 | 19/05/1943 | 34 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 17/06/1945 | 02/07/1945 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 20/09/1946 | 19/10/1946 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2993 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/10/1948 | 22/10/1948 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3314 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63344 |
||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1948 | 03/11/1948 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 04/03/1949 | 16/03/1949 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1951 | 03/11/1951 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24273 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/03/1954 | 08/04/1954 | 35 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 03/07/1956 | 14/08/1956 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 24247 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/05/1959 | 19/06/1959 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 24229 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/06/1959 | 09/07/1959 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/09/1961 | 12/10/1961 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 24/05/1963 | 08/07/1963 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 24266 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/07/1963 | 30/07/1963 | 2 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
03/10/1948 | Darlington Works | The first new 'A.1,' No. 60130, was on trial W/E 24/9 and No. 60131 during W/E 2/10, both are nameless. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 517, 2342/71, 3344, 5027/28, 5852/83, 7300/07, 8141, E8723, 9392, 9881, 61638, 63099, 69841 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60804, 60980, 62729/75, 63333/91, 65666/92, 65752, 68302/99, 68675, 68744, 69868 and 'Austerity' 77050. No. 9089 was broken up W/E 24/9. | SLS/194811 |
02/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103. Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329. |
SLS/194901 |
03/12/1966 | Allocation of Q6 class (Tyne Dock) | Tyne Dock: 63344/66/81/7, 63413/20/6/9/31/55/8; Sunderland: 63346/95, 63405/36/7; West Hartlepool: 63368/94/7, 63407/40/50. | SLS/196701 |
02/07/1967 | Eastern Region (North Eastern Section) steam stock (Tyne Dock) | Steam stock has been reduced to 124 as from 2nd July. The allocation of following classes is as under:- Q6 Sunderland: 63395. Tyne Dock: 63344/87, 63431. J27 Sunderland: 65795, 65811/55/79/82/92/94. K1 West Hartlepool: 62045. Tyne Dock: 62005/07/11/50/60. B1 Low Moor: 61030 Nyala, 61306/37. Jubilee Holbeck: 45562 Alberta, 45593 Kolhapur, 45697 Achilles. C1.5 Holbeck: 44826/28/52/96, 44912/43/83, 45080, 45219/73, 45428. Normanton: 44824/54/57, 44990, 45075. Low Moor: 44662/94, 45208. Of the 8F remaining on the N.E. Region, 4 are at Holbeck and 24 at Royston. The W.D. 2-8-0 are allocated to West Hartlepool (6), Sunderland (7), Normanton (14) and Low Moor (D; the 2-6-4Ts to Holbeck (4), Normanton (7), and Low Moor (5) and the C1.4 2-6-0s to West Hartlepool (D, North Blyth (4), Holbeck (2) and Normanton (3). There is still one steam locomotive in Departmental Stock J72 0-6-OT Deptl. 58 (ex 69005). | SLS/196708 |
13/08/1967 | West Hartlepool MPD | The following were on West Hartlepool on 13th August: 43015, 62026/41/2/4, 63344/87/94/7, 63407/31/5, 90061/74/6/116/210/30/54/309/39/47/60/434/59/78/92, 90627/77/95, D2068/77/8, D2153, D2205, D3137/9, D3672, D5152/65, D6756/63/6/9. | SLS/196709 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1251 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
23/02/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/02/1923. Dep: 23/03/1923. | ||
12/06/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/06/1923. Dep: 20/06/1923. | ||
26/07/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/07/1923. Dep: 07/08/1923. | ||
07/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/11/1923. Dep: 21/11/1923. | ||
03/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1925. Dep: 18/09/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number D212 (Diagram 50) |
||
16/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1928. Dep: 06/12/1928. | ||
15/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1931. Dep: 01/07/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D616 (Diagram 50) |
||
05/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1934. Dep: 16/02/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1944 (Diagram 50) |
||
15/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1937. Dep: 05/01/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24166 (Diagram 50) |
||
12/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
06/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/04/1940. Dep: 24/04/1940. | ||
16/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1940. Dep: 16/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3157 (Diagram 50A) |
||
16/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1943. Dep: 19/05/1943. | ||
17/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/06/1945. Dep: 02/07/1945. | ||
14/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3344 | ||
20/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1946. Dep: 19/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2993 (Diagram 50A) |
||
01/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1948. Dep: 22/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3314 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63344 |
||
25/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/10/1948. Dep: 03/11/1948. | ||
04/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/03/1949. Dep: 16/03/1949. | ||
08/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1951. Dep: 03/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24273 (Diagram 50A) |
||
05/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/03/1954. Dep: 08/04/1954. | ||
10/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (51G) | ||
03/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1956. Dep: 14/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24247 (Diagram 50) |
||
22/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1959. Dep: 19/06/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24229 (Diagram 50A) |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
29/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/06/1959. Dep: 09/07/1959. | ||
18/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/09/1961. Dep: 12/10/1961. | ||
24/05/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1963. Dep: 08/07/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24266 (Diagram 50A) |
||
29/07/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/07/1963. Dep: 30/07/1963. | ||
07/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) | ||
12/06/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Normanton (55E) | ||
02/10/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
02/07/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63344 from West Hartlepool (51C) |