Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 160 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 160 Week
» 39206 Month
» 413219 Year
» 1634784 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1253 m/e 03/1913
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3346   14/04/1946
British Railways 63346 w/e 04/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class Q6
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q603/1913
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number 441A
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 03/1913 to Tyne Dock (TDK)
Withdrawal Mon 29/05/1967 off Sunderland (52G)
Service Life 54 yrs , 3 mths

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Willoughbys, Choppington, 8/67

Allocations
Code Name From Date
TDK Tyne Dock (New) m/e 03/1913
BOR Borough Gardens on 02/03/1927
NEV Neville Hill on 28/03/1943
HAV Haverton Hill on 19/06/1943
NPT Newport (Teeside) on 29/09/1944
TDK Tyne Dock on 14/01/1946
CON Consett on 13/04/1947
54C Borough Gardens on 10/06/1956
52K Consett on 14/06/1959
52G Sunderland on 04/10/1964
   Withdrawn on 29/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CON Consett on 13/04/1947
ALLOC 54C Borough Gardens 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 54D Consett on 14/06/1959
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 10/10/1964
WDN   on 29/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1913 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D175)
07/05/1931 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2393)
07/09/1938 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number AW7)
08/01/1941 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2385)
12/02/1944 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2258)
03/04/1947 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2149)
05/08/1950 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2874)
07/03/1953 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 24252)
03/02/1956 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 24230)
22/10/1958 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24239)
10/03/1962 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24211)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 13/06/1924 02/09/1924 82 days General  
Gateshead Works 06/10/1924 08/10/1924 3 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 11/08/1927 22/11/1927 104 days General  
Gateshead Works 12/07/1928 21/08/1928 41 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 02/04/1931 07/05/1931 36 days General
Boiler number 2393 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 12/06/1934 18/07/1934 37 days General  
Darlington Works 12/11/1934 06/12/1934 25 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Darlington Works 27/06/1938 07/09/1938 73 days General
Boiler number AW7 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 10/12/1940 08/01/1941 30 days General
Boiler number 2385 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 21/01/1944 12/02/1944 23 days General
Boiler number 2258 (Diagram 50)
 
Gateshead Works 08/01/1946 22/01/1946 15 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 01/02/1947 03/04/1947 62 days General
Boiler number 2149 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 09/04/1947 17/04/1947 9 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 07/07/1948 31/08/1948 56 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63346
 
Darlington Works 21/06/1950 05/08/1950 46 days General
Boiler number 2874 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 08/08/1950 16/08/1950 9 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 06/02/1953 07/03/1953 30 days General
Boiler number 24252 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 09/03/1953 13/03/1953 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 09/01/1956 03/02/1956 26 days General
Boiler number 24230 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 23/09/1958 22/10/1958 30 days General
Boiler number 24239 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 12/02/1962 10/03/1962 27 days General
Boiler number 24211 (Diagram 50A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
23/02/1955 Snowplough fitted Q6\'s On 23rd February, 0-8-0 Q6 63346 and another unidentified Q6 were observed coupled together with large pusher type snow ploughs attached at each end of the locomotives. The locomotives were on snow plough duty on the Consett-Shotley Bridge-Newcastle line, proceeding in the direction of Newcastle near Ebchester. Later on the same afternoon, the two engines were seen near Annfield Plain on the Consett-Tyne Dock line. On 19th February, 0-6-0T J71 68290 was observed near East Boldon travelling light in the direction of Newcastle. SLS/195504
03/12/1966 Allocation of Q6 class (Sunderland) Tyne Dock: 63344/66/81/7, 63413/20/6/9/31/55/8; Sunderland: 63346/95, 63405/36/7; West Hartlepool: 63368/94/7, 63407/40/50. SLS/196701

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1913 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1253
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)
Diagram 50 boiler fitted
   
02/03/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR)    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
19/06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV)    
29/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
14/01/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
14/04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3346    
13/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Consett (CON)    
10/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Consett (52K)    
04/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
29/05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 63346 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev