|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 1921 | 07/1921 | General | Boiler number D101 (Diagram 50) |
|||
1924 | 02/1924 | General | Boiler number D167 (Diagram 50) |
||||
Darlington Works | 15/11/1927 | 17/02/1928 | 95 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 27/11/1930 | 09/01/1931 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2392 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/09/1933 | 17/10/1933 | 36 days | General | Boiler number D678 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/04/1936 | 05/09/1936 | 156 days | General | Boiler number 2813 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/12/1938 | 13/12/1938 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/06/1939 | 07/07/1939 | 31 days | General | Boiler number HL107 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/05/1942 | 03/07/1942 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2570 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/04/1944 | 19/05/1944 | 23 days | General | Boiler number D1941 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 24/10/1945 | 09/11/1945 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 30/01/1947 | 22/03/1947 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 2387 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/04/1950 | 20/05/1950 | 24 days | General | Boiler number HL112 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63356 |
||
Darlington Works | 22/05/1950 | 23/05/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/05/1950 | 31/05/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1952 | 01/11/1952 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24241 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/11/1952 | 04/11/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/11/1952 | 14/11/1952 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/11/1953 | 04/12/1953 | 23 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 23/09/1954 | 20/10/1954 | 28 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1956 | 04/06/1956 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24259 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 23/12/1957 | 17/01/1958 | 26 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 21/03/1960 | 25/04/1960 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 24205 (Diagram 50A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1280 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1921. Dep: ?/07/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number D101 (Diagram 50) |
||
22/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
08/11/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
15/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1927. Dep: 17/02/1928. | ||
27/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1930. Dep: 09/01/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2392 (Diagram 50) |
||
12/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1933. Dep: 17/10/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D678 (Diagram 50) |
||
03/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1936. Dep: 05/09/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2813 (Diagram 50) |
||
02/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/12/1938. Dep: 13/12/1938. | ||
07/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1939. Dep: 07/07/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL107 (Diagram 50) |
||
10/06/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
26/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1942. Dep: 03/07/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2570 (Diagram 50) |
||
04/12/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
27/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1944. Dep: 19/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1941 (Diagram 50) |
||
24/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/10/1945. Dep: 09/11/1945. | ||
28/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3356 | ||
30/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1947. Dep: 22/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2387 (Diagram 50) |
||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
27/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1950. Dep: 20/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL112 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63356 |
||
22/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/05/1950. Dep: 23/05/1950. | ||
30/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/05/1950. Dep: 31/05/1950. | ||
08/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1952. Dep: 01/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24241 (Diagram 50) |
||
03/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/11/1952. Dep: 04/11/1952. | ||
06/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/11/1952. Dep: 14/11/1952. | ||
12/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/11/1953. Dep: 04/12/1953. | ||
23/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 23/09/1954. Dep: 20/10/1954. | ||
04/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1956. Dep: 04/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24259 (Diagram 50) |
||
23/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/12/1957. Dep: 17/01/1958. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
21/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1960. Dep: 25/04/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24205 (Diagram 50A) |
||
23/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
03/12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63356 from Blyth (North) (52F) |