|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 1922 | 07/1922 | General | Boiler number D154 (Diagram 50) |
|||
Darlington Works | 22/08/1924 | 27/10/1924 | 67 days | General | Boiler number D616 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 04/05/1927 | 23/09/1927 | 143 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 23/04/1931 | 28/05/1931 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2386 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/08/1934 | 20/09/1934 | 30 days | General | Boiler number AW17 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/09/1938 | 30/12/1938 | 109 days | General | Boiler number 2992 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/07/1941 | 18/08/1941 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3007 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/08/1943 | 28/09/1943 | 39 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 16/01/1947 | 22/03/1947 | 66 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/09/1947 | 01/10/1947 | 28 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/06/1948 | 01/07/1948 | 22 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63365 |
||
Darlington Works | 29/06/1950 | 23/08/1950 | 56 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 27/12/1950 | 30/12/1950 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1951 | 03/11/1951 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1953 | 17/04/1953 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 24222 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/09/1953 | 28/09/1953 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1956 | 06/09/1956 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1957 | 29/08/1957 | 51 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 25/06/1959 | 10/07/1959 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 07/04/1960 | 03/06/1960 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 24262 (Diagram 50A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1311 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1922. Dep: ?/07/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number D154 (Diagram 50) |
||
22/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1924. Dep: 27/10/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number D616 (Diagram 50) |
||
01/02/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
04/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1927. Dep: 23/09/1927. | ||
23/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1931. Dep: 28/05/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2386 (Diagram 50) |
||
22/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1934. Dep: 20/09/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number AW17 (Diagram 50) |
||
13/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1938. Dep: 30/12/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2992 (Diagram 50A) |
||
29/03/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
14/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1941. Dep: 18/08/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3007 (Diagram 50A) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
21/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1943. Dep: 28/09/1943. | ||
09/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
23/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Consett (CON) | ||
20/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3365 | ||
16/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1947. Dep: 22/03/1947. | ||
04/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/09/1947. Dep: 01/10/1947. | ||
10/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/06/1948. Dep: 01/07/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63365 |
||
29/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1950. Dep: 23/08/1950. | ||
27/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/12/1950. Dep: 30/12/1950. | ||
31/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/10/1951. Dep: 03/11/1951. | ||
12/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1953. Dep: 17/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24222 (Diagram 50A) |
||
28/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 28/09/1953. Dep: 28/09/1953. | ||
08/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/08/1956. Dep: 06/09/1956. | ||
10/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/07/1957. Dep: 29/08/1957. | ||
25/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/06/1959. Dep: 10/07/1959. | ||
07/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1960. Dep: 03/06/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24262 (Diagram 50A) |
||
06/05/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
10/06/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63365 from Sunderland (52G) |