Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 296 Today
» 815 Yesterday
» 296 Week
» 16275 Month
» 211729 Year
» 1096110 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NER 1361 m/e 08/1913
LNER (1946) 3367   06/04/1946
BR 63367 w/e 27/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class Q6
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q608/1913
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number 451A
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 08/1913 to Tyne Dock (TDK)
Withdrawal Mon 31/08/1964 off Sunderland (52G)
Service Life 51 yrs , 1 mth

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to G Cohen, Cargo Fleet, 1/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
TDK Tyne Dock (New) m/e 08/1913
YK York (North) 08/03/1924
HLD Hull Dairycoates 02/01/1930
WHL West Hartlepool 05/03/1945
SKN Stockton 02/11/1947
HAV Haverton Hill 06/02/1949
51L Thornaby 14/06/1959
52G Sunderland 07/07/1963
   Withdrawn 31/08/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SKN Stockton w/e 08/11/1947
ALLOC HAV Haverton Hill w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC 51L Thornaby 14/06/1959
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 5w/e 10/08/1963
WDN   31/08/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1913 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D238)
28/08/1930 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D918)
14/08/1933 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number E4/10)
22/09/1936 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2817)
03/07/1941 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D1941)
20/03/1944 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2639)
08/03/1947 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2820)
19/01/1950 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2639)
12/07/1952 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 24232)
01/06/1957 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24260)
12/08/1961 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24326)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 19/11/1923 02/02/1924 76 days General  
Gateshead Works 20/06/1927 21/10/1927 124 days General
Boiler number 20 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 11/06/1930 28/08/1930 79 days General
Boiler number D918 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 05/07/1933 14/08/1933 41 days General
Boiler number E4/10 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 14/04/1936 22/09/1936 162 days General
Boiler number 2817 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 09/11/1938 28/11/1938 20 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 23/01/1939 07/03/1939 44 days General  
Darlington Works 28/05/1941 03/07/1941 37 days General
Boiler number D1941 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 04/05/1943 31/05/1943 28 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 28/02/1944 20/03/1944 22 days General
Boiler number 2639 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 09/03/1946 06/04/1946 29 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3367
 
Darlington Works 27/12/1946 08/03/1947 72 days General
Boiler number 2820 (Diagram 50)
 
Gateshead Works 10/11/1948 25/11/1948 16 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63367
 
Darlington Works 28/12/1949 19/01/1950 23 days General
Boiler number 2639 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 26/01/1950 01/02/1950 7 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 23/06/1952 12/07/1952 20 days General
Boiler number 24232 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 14/07/1952 16/07/1952 3 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 02/09/1953 01/10/1953 30 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 28/10/1954 25/11/1954 29 days General
Boiler number 4019 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 13/05/1957 01/06/1957 20 days General
Boiler number 24260 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 03/06/1957 05/06/1957 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 14/06/1957 24/06/1957 11 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 01/12/1958 12/01/1959 43 days Light Casual
Derailment damage
 
Darlington Works 03/11/1959 05/11/1959 3 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 26/05/1960 06/07/1960 42 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 22/06/1961 12/08/1961 52 days General
Boiler number 24326 (Diagram 50A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1913 To Service To service as NER Number 1361
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)
Diagram 50 boiler fitted
   
19/11/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1923. Dep: 02/02/1924.    
08/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
20/06/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1927. Dep: 21/10/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 20 (Diagram 50)
   
02/01/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
11/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1930. Dep: 28/08/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D918 (Diagram 50)
   
05/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1933. Dep: 14/08/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number E4/10 (Diagram 50)
   
14/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1936. Dep: 22/09/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2817 (Diagram 50)
   
09/11/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/11/1938. Dep: 28/11/1938.    
23/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1939. Dep: 07/03/1939.    
28/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1941. Dep: 03/07/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1941 (Diagram 50)
   
04/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/05/1943. Dep: 31/05/1943.    
28/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1944. Dep: 20/03/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2639 (Diagram 50)
   
05/03/1945 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
09/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/03/1946. Dep: 06/04/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3367
   
27/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1946. Dep: 08/03/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2820 (Diagram 50)
   
02/11/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (SKN)    
10/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/11/1948. Dep: 25/11/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63367
   
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV)    
28/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1949. Dep: 19/01/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2639 (Diagram 50)
   
26/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/01/1950. Dep: 01/02/1950.    
23/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1952. Dep: 12/07/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24232 (Diagram 50)
   
14/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/07/1952. Dep: 16/07/1952.    
02/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/09/1953. Dep: 01/10/1953.    
28/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1954. Dep: 25/11/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4019 (Diagram 50A)
   
13/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1957. Dep: 01/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24260 (Diagram 50A)
   
03/06/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/06/1957. Dep: 05/06/1957.    
14/06/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/06/1957. Dep: 24/06/1957.    
01/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/12/1958. Dep: 12/01/1959.
Work undertaken:
Derailment damage
   
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
03/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/11/1959. Dep: 05/11/1959.    
26/05/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 26/05/1960. Dep: 06/07/1960.    
22/06/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1961. Dep: 12/08/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24326 (Diagram 50A)
   
07/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
31/08/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63367 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev