Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 106 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4066 Week
» 33652 Month
» 407665 Year
» 1629230 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2214 m/e 05/1917
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3371 on 17/03/1946
British Railways 63371 on 06/05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class Q6
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q605/1917
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number 111A
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 05/1917 to Selby (SEL)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 07/11/1965 off Tyne Dock (52H)
Service Life 48 yrs, 6 mths , 8 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Hughes Bolckow, Blyth, 12/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SEL Selby (New) m/e 05/1917
SUN Sunderland on 05/07/1934
BOR Borough Gardens on 15/01/1938
BLA Blaydon on 15/02/1941
NPT Newport (Teeside) on 28/03/1943
51L Thornaby on 01/06/1958
52H Tyne Dock on 07/07/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 07/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NPT Newport (Teeside) w/e 07/02/1948
ALLOC 51L Thornaby on 08/06/1958
ALLOC 52H Tyne Dock 5w/e 10/08/1963
WDN   on 07/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1917 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D656)
24/10/1923 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D190)
20/09/1928 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D139)
11/08/1931 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D951)
21/04/1934 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2566)
20/11/1943 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2394)
05/07/1947 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2890)
06/05/1950 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 2984)
02/07/1955 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24154)
27/12/1957 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24274)
04/11/1961 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24295)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 29/07/1923 24/10/1923 88 days General
Boiler number D190 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 27/05/1926 24/09/1926 121 days General  
Darlington Works 11/07/1928 20/09/1928 72 days General
Boiler number D139 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 25/06/1931 11/08/1931 48 days General
Boiler number D951 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 22/03/1934 21/04/1934 31 days General
Boiler number 2566 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 23/04/1934 26/04/1934 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 19/12/1938 07/02/1939 51 days General  
Darlington Works 11/03/1941 16/04/1941 37 days General  
Darlington Works 26/10/1943 20/11/1943 26 days General
Boiler number 2394 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 21/08/1945 18/09/1945 29 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 08/01/1946 05/02/1946 29 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 24/02/1946 14/03/1946 19 days Unclassified
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3371
 
Darlington Works 03/06/1947 05/07/1947 33 days General
Boiler number 24247 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 11/04/1950 06/05/1950 26 days General
Boiler number 24246 (Diagram 50A)
Renumbered to BR 63371
 
Darlington Works 08/05/1950 11/05/1950 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 22/10/1952 15/11/1952 25 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 17/11/1952 19/11/1952 3 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 17/06/1954 23/07/1954 37 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 13/06/1955 02/07/1955 20 days General
Boiler number 24154 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 04/07/1955 05/07/1955 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 11/07/1955 14/07/1955 4 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 25/11/1957 27/12/1957 33 days General
Boiler number 24274 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 08/02/1960 13/02/1960 6 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 18/09/1961 04/11/1961 48 days General
Boiler number 24295 (Diagram 50A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1917 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2214
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Selby (SEL)
Diagram 50 boiler fitted
   
29/07/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1923. Dep: 24/10/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D190 (Diagram 50)
   
27/05/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1926. Dep: 24/09/1926.    
11/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1928. Dep: 20/09/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D139 (Diagram 50)
   
25/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1931. Dep: 11/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D951 (Diagram 50)
   
22/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1934. Dep: 21/04/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2566 (Diagram 50)
   
23/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/04/1934. Dep: 26/04/1934.    
05/07/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (SUN)    
15/01/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR)    
19/12/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1938. Dep: 07/02/1939.    
15/02/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
11/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1941. Dep: 16/04/1941.    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
26/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1943. Dep: 20/11/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2394 (Diagram 50)
   
21/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/08/1945. Dep: 18/09/1945.    
08/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/01/1946. Dep: 05/02/1946.    
24/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/02/1946. Dep: 14/03/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3371
   
03/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1947. Dep: 05/07/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24247 (Diagram 50)
   
11/04/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1950. Dep: 06/05/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24246 (Diagram 50A)
Renumbered to BR 63371
   
08/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/05/1950. Dep: 11/05/1950.    
22/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/10/1952. Dep: 15/11/1952.    
17/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/11/1952. Dep: 19/11/1952.    
17/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/06/1954. Dep: 23/07/1954.    
13/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1955. Dep: 02/07/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24154 (Diagram 50A)
   
04/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/07/1955. Dep: 05/07/1955.    
11/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/07/1955. Dep: 14/07/1955.    
25/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1957. Dep: 27/12/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24274 (Diagram 50A)
   
01/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
08/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/02/1960. Dep: 13/02/1960.    
18/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1961. Dep: 04/11/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24295 (Diagram 50A)
   
07/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
07/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63371 from Tyne Dock (52H)    

prev prev