|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 17/04/1924 | 30/06/1924 | 75 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/09/1927 | 14/12/1927 | 78 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 03/03/1930 | 10/04/1930 | 39 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1933 | 21/06/1933 | 42 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 05/07/1935 | 20/08/1935 | 47 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 29/09/1938 | 22/12/1938 | 85 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/12/1940 | 03/02/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/03/1941 | 24/03/1941 | 15 days | Unclassified | Tender only |
||
Darlington Works | 19/01/1943 | 16/02/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 30/05/1944 | 19/06/1944 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1945 | 08/09/1945 | 30 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/10/1946 | 01/11/1946 | 16 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3373 |
||
Darlington Works | 07/01/1948 | 06/02/1948 | 31 days | General | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3373 |
||
Gateshead Works | 01/07/1949 | 15/07/1949 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 16/08/1950 | 21/09/1950 | 37 days | General | Renumbered to BR 63373 |
||
Darlington Works | 08/11/1950 | 16/11/1950 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/05/1952 | 28/06/1952 | 31 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/06/1952 | 04/07/1952 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/10/1954 | 11/11/1954 | 28 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1955 | 06/07/1955 | 31 days | Light Casual | Derailment damage |
||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1957 | 29/06/1957 | 24 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/07/1957 | 02/07/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/08/1959 | 26/08/1959 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 03/05/1960 | 09/05/1960 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/10/1960 | 25/11/1960 | 38 days | General | 24305 25/11/60 b50A |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/02/1948 | Darlington Works | New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) | SLS/194804 |
29/01/1955 | Stainmore Coke | The coke traffic over the Darlington-Kirkby Stephen line has increased of late and a couple of class Q6 engines, Nos. 63355 an 63373 have been sent to the latter shed to work the coke between Kirkby and Tebay. The most interesting part of this transfer was the fact that the Civil Engineer allowed these engines to work a train over Deepdale and Belah viaducts, and the weight restriction has been lifted to allow double heading of some test trains between Saint Helens and Tebay. These trains are made up to 34 wagons of 21 tons each worked by two class 4 2-6-0's at the front and banked by a similar engine at the rear. The banking engine is dropped at Stainmore Summit in both directions. I think that this is the first time that double heading has been allowed over this route. | SLS/195505 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1917 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2216 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) |
||
17/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1924. Dep: 30/06/1924. | ||
28/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1927. Dep: 14/12/1927. | ||
03/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1930. Dep: 10/04/1930. | ||
11/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1933. Dep: 21/06/1933. | ||
05/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1935. Dep: 20/08/1935. | ||
29/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1938. Dep: 22/12/1938. | ||
30/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1940. Dep: 03/02/1941. | ||
10/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/03/1941. Dep: 24/03/1941. Work undertaken: Tender only |
||
19/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1943. Dep: 16/02/1943. | ||
04/12/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
30/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/05/1944. Dep: 19/06/1944. | ||
18/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
10/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1945. Dep: 08/09/1945. | ||
17/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/10/1946. Dep: 01/11/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3373 |
||
07/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1948. Dep: 06/02/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3373 |
||
01/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/07/1949. Dep: 15/07/1949. | ||
13/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
19/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
16/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
16/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1950. Dep: 21/09/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63373 |
||
08/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/11/1950. Dep: 16/11/1950. | ||
29/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1952. Dep: 28/06/1952. | ||
30/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/06/1952. Dep: 04/07/1952. | ||
15/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/10/1954. Dep: 11/11/1954. | ||
03/04/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kirkby Stephen (51H) | ||
06/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/06/1955. Dep: 06/07/1955. Work undertaken: Derailment damage |
||
26/06/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
06/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1957. Dep: 29/06/1957. | ||
01/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/07/1957. Dep: 02/07/1957. | ||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
19/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/08/1959. Dep: 26/08/1959. | ||
03/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/05/1960. Dep: 09/05/1960. | ||
19/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1960. Dep: 25/11/1960. Work undertaken: 24305 25/11/60 b50A |
||
03/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
15/07/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63373 from West Auckland (51F) |