|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 23/04/1924 | 30/06/1924 | 69 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/05/1927 | 07/09/1927 | 101 days | General | Boiler number E4/49 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/03/1930 | 02/05/1930 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 4 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/11/1932 | 05/01/1933 | 38 days | General | Boiler number D613 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/02/1935 | 13/03/1935 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24223 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/05/1938 | 05/08/1938 | 80 days | General | Boiler number HL110 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/10/1940 | 26/10/1940 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 3149 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/02/1943 | 17/03/1943 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 3152 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 10/06/1945 | 25/06/1945 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 02/10/1946 | 02/11/1946 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2383 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3376 |
||
Darlington Works | 11/01/1950 | 02/02/1950 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 2999 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63376 |
||
Darlington Works | 21/02/1952 | 14/03/1952 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 24218 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1955 | 25/02/1955 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 24208 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/03/1959 | 24/04/1959 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24272 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/09/1960 | 19/10/1960 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 04/01/1963 | 17/01/1963 | 14 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1917 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2219 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Selby (SEL) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
23/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1924. Dep: 30/06/1924. | ||
30/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1927. Dep: 07/09/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/49 (Diagram 50) |
||
15/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1930. Dep: 02/05/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4 (Diagram 50) |
||
29/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1932. Dep: 05/01/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D613 (Diagram 50) |
||
12/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1935. Dep: 13/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24223 (Diagram 50) |
||
18/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1938. Dep: 05/08/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL110 (Diagram 50) |
||
07/08/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
02/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1940. Dep: 26/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3149 (Diagram 50A) |
||
06/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1943. Dep: 17/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3152 (Diagram 50A) |
||
18/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
13/05/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
10/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/06/1945. Dep: 25/06/1945. | ||
02/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1946. Dep: 02/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2383 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3376 |
||
20/07/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
11/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1950. Dep: 02/02/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2999 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63376 |
||
21/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1952. Dep: 14/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24218 (Diagram 50A) |
||
02/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1955. Dep: 25/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24208 (Diagram 50A) |
||
24/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1959. Dep: 24/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24272 (Diagram 50A) |
||
30/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/09/1960. Dep: 19/10/1960. | ||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
04/01/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/01/1963. Dep: 17/01/1963. | ||
01/07/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63376 from Sunderland (52G) |