Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 164 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 164 Week
» 39210 Month
» 413223 Year
» 1634788 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2219 m/e 06/1917
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3376   02/11/1946
British Railways 63376 w/e 04/02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class Q6
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q606/1917
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number 111A
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 06/1917 to Selby (SEL)
Withdrawal Mon 01/07/1963 off Sunderland (52G)
Service Life 46 yrs, 1 mth , 0 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 8/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SEL Selby (New) m/e 06/1917
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 07/08/1939
HLS Hull Springhead on 18/10/1943
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 13/05/1944
BLA Blaydon on 20/07/1947
52G Sunderland on 09/09/1962
   Withdrawn on 01/07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BLA Blaydon on 20/07/1947
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   on 01/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1917 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D619)
07/09/1927 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number E4/49)
05/01/1933 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D613)
13/03/1935 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2640)
05/08/1938 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number HL110)
26/10/1940 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 3149)
17/03/1943 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 3152)
02/11/1946 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2383)
02/02/1950 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 2999)
14/03/1952 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24218)
25/02/1955 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24208)
24/04/1959 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24272)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 23/04/1924 30/06/1924 69 days General  
Darlington Works 30/05/1927 07/09/1927 101 days General
Boiler number E4/49 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 15/03/1930 02/05/1930 49 days General
Boiler number 4 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 29/11/1932 05/01/1933 38 days General
Boiler number D613 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 12/02/1935 13/03/1935 30 days General
Boiler number 24223 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 18/05/1938 05/08/1938 80 days General
Boiler number HL110 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 02/10/1940 26/10/1940 25 days General
Boiler number 3149 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 06/02/1943 17/03/1943 40 days General
Boiler number 3152 (Diagram 50A)
 
Gateshead Works 10/06/1945 25/06/1945 16 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 02/10/1946 02/11/1946 32 days General
Boiler number 2383 (Diagram 50)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3376
 
Darlington Works 11/01/1950 02/02/1950 23 days General
Boiler number 2999 (Diagram 50A)
Renumbered to BR 63376
 
Darlington Works 21/02/1952 14/03/1952 23 days General
Boiler number 24218 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 02/02/1955 25/02/1955 24 days General
Boiler number 24208 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 24/03/1959 24/04/1959 32 days General
Boiler number 24272 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 30/09/1960 19/10/1960 20 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 04/01/1963 17/01/1963 14 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1917 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2219
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Selby (SEL)
Diagram 50 boiler fitted
   
07/08/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
18/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
13/05/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
20/07/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
09/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
01/07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63376 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev