Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 334 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2899 Week
» 1637 Month
» 415958 Year
» 1637523 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2231 m/e 12/1917
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3388   15/09/1946
British Railways 63388 w/e 25/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class Q6
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q612/1917
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number 111A
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 12/1917 to Tyne Dock (TDK)
Withdrawal Mon 16/03/1964 off Sunderland (52G)
Service Life 46 yrs, 3 mths , 15 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 15/4/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
TDK Tyne Dock (New) m/e 12/1917
HLS Hull Springhead on 31/01/1925
BLA Blaydon on 31/03/1927
HTN Heaton on 28/10/1939
TDK Tyne Dock on 02/03/1940
BOR Borough Gardens on 28/03/1943
NPT Newport (Teeside) on 06/02/1949
51L Thornaby on 01/06/1958
51F West Auckland on 23/06/1963
52G Sunderland on 06/10/1963
   Withdrawn on 16/03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NPT Newport (Teeside) w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC 51L Thornaby on 08/06/1958
ALLOC 51F West Auckland 4w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 12/10/1963
WDN   w/e 16/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1917 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D699)
12/1922 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D156)
03/12/1924 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D192)
17/03/1931 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2384)
01/05/1935 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2652)
09/01/1941 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 3155)
03/02/1944 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 2989)
06/08/1955 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24181)
17/03/1962 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24220)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 1922 12/1922   General
Boiler number D156 (Diagram 50)
 
Gateshead Works 29/09/1924 03/12/1924 66 days General
Boiler number D192 (Diagram 50)
 
Gateshead Works 12/12/1927 28/03/1928 108 days General  
Gateshead Works 09/02/1931 17/03/1931 37 days General
Boiler number 2384 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 20/03/1935 01/05/1935 43 days General
Boiler number 2652 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 19/01/1938 25/03/1938 66 days General  
Darlington Works 13/03/1940 29/03/1940 17 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 11/12/1940 09/01/1941 30 days General
Boiler number 3155 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 13/10/1943 03/02/1944 114 days General
Boiler number 2989 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 28/02/1947 03/05/1947 65 days General  
Darlington Works 06/05/1947 31/05/1947 26 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 06/12/1948 20/12/1948 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63388
 
Darlington Works 01/02/1950 15/04/1950 74 days General
Boiler number 24213 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 23/11/1951 20/12/1951 28 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 10/01/1953 07/02/1953 29 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 10/02/1953 17/02/1953 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 14/07/1955 06/08/1955 24 days General
Boiler number 24181 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 08/08/1955 09/08/1955 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 02/04/1958 01/05/1958 30 days General
Boiler number 24268 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 13/05/1958 20/05/1958 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 13/08/1959 17/08/1959 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 08/09/1959 21/09/1959 14 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 07/12/1959 08/12/1959 2 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 13/02/1962 17/03/1962 33 days General
Boiler number 24220 (Diagram 50A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/03/1962 Darlington MPD (Ex-Works) Ex-Works on 51A: D3072, D3874, D5108, 43055, 43101, 60835, 60939, 61019/39, 63388, 65794, 65889/92, 68011, 80116, 90072, 90342, 90503. Waiting works on 51A: 12115, 43070/5, 46494, 60811/44, 61237, 68754, 78015, 92098. SLS/196205

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1917 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2231
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)
Diagram 50 boiler fitted
   
31/01/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
31/03/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
28/10/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
02/03/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR)    
15/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3388    
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
01/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
23/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to West Auckland (51F)    
06/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
16/03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63388 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev