|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 23/06/1923 | 12/09/1923 | 82 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1925 | 14/09/1925 | 113 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/09/1925 | 16/10/1925 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1928 | 13/09/1928 | 66 days | General | Boiler number D911 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/02/1931 | 02/04/1931 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2388 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/03/1934 | 23/03/1934 | 23 days | General | Boiler number E4/22 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/12/1936 | 12/02/1937 | 54 days | General | Boiler number HL103 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/10/1939 | 29/11/1939 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/04/1942 | 06/05/1942 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2653 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/07/1944 | 05/08/1944 | 33 days | General | Boiler number HL111 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/12/1946 | 25/01/1947 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 2440 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 25/10/1948 | 05/11/1948 | 12 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63390 |
||
Darlington Works | 08/09/1950 | 30/09/1950 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 24158 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/02/1953 | 28/03/1953 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 24255 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/03/1953 | 02/04/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/04/1953 | 11/04/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/04/1953 | 07/05/1953 | 21 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 10/04/1956 | 09/05/1956 | 30 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 22/01/1957 | 12/02/1957 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 11/02/1958 | 21/03/1958 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 24199 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 21/11/1958 | 25/02/1959 | 97 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1959 | 21/08/1959 | 43 days | Light Casual | After collision |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1918 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2233 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
23/06/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1923. Dep: 12/09/1923. | ||
22/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
25/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1925. Dep: 14/09/1925. | ||
30/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/09/1925. Dep: 16/10/1925. | ||
03/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
10/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1928. Dep: 13/09/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D911 (Diagram 50) |
||
18/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1931. Dep: 02/04/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2388 (Diagram 50) |
||
01/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1934. Dep: 23/03/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/22 (Diagram 50) |
||
22/02/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
21/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1936. Dep: 12/02/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL103 (Diagram 50) |
||
17/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1939. Dep: 29/11/1939. | ||
08/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1942. Dep: 06/05/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2653 (Diagram 50) |
||
04/12/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
04/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1944. Dep: 05/08/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL111 (Diagram 50) |
||
03/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3390 | ||
05/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1946. Dep: 25/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2440 (Diagram 50) |
||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
25/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/10/1948. Dep: 05/11/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63390 |
||
08/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1950. Dep: 30/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24158 (Diagram 50) |
||
23/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1953. Dep: 28/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24255 (Diagram 50) |
||
30/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/03/1953. Dep: 02/04/1953. | ||
09/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/04/1953. Dep: 11/04/1953. | ||
17/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/04/1953. Dep: 07/05/1953. | ||
10/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 10/04/1956. Dep: 09/05/1956. | ||
22/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/01/1957. Dep: 12/02/1957. | ||
11/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1958. Dep: 21/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24199 (Diagram 50A) |
||
21/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 21/11/1958. Dep: 25/02/1959. | ||
10/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/07/1959. Dep: 21/08/1959. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
24/02/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
08/08/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63390 from Tyne Dock (52H) |