|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1924 | 02/1924 | General | |||||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1925 | 30/03/1926 | 106 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 18/05/1928 | 06/07/1928 | 50 days | General | Boiler number E4/38 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/10/1930 | 14/11/1930 | 43 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/10/1933 | 24/11/1933 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 2385 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/04/1937 | 18/05/1937 | 42 days | General | Boiler number D1956 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/08/1937 | 01/09/1937 | 31 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1940 | 09/04/1940 | 29 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 21/04/1942 | 09/06/1942 | 50 days | General | Boiler number AW28 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/04/1945 | 09/06/1945 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 2433 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 1946 | 22/11/1946 | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3391 |
|||
Darlington Works | 30/08/1948 | 17/09/1948 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 2637 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63391 |
||
Darlington Works | 10/09/1951 | 29/09/1951 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 24201 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/10/1951 | 13/10/1951 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/07/1955 | 02/09/1955 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 24244 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 29/07/1957 | 11/09/1957 | 45 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 22/08/1958 | 18/09/1958 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 24236 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/03/1960 | 11/05/1960 | 42 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 31/08/1962 | 25/09/1962 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 30/10/1962 | 30/10/1962 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 18/03/1963 | 24/04/1963 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 24240 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/04/1963 | 07/05/1963 | 8 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
03/10/1948 | Darlington Works | The first new 'A.1,' No. 60130, was on trial W/E 24/9 and No. 60131 during W/E 2/10, both are nameless. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 517, 2342/71, 3344, 5027/28, 5852/83, 7300/07, 8141, E8723, 9392, 9881, 61638, 63099, 69841 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60804, 60980, 62729/75, 63333/91, 65666/92, 65752, 68302/99, 68675, 68744, 69868 and 'Austerity' 77050. No. 9089 was broken up W/E 24/9. | SLS/194811 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1918 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2234 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
12/05/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
01/07/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
15/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1925. Dep: 30/03/1926. | ||
18/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1928. Dep: 06/07/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/38 (Diagram 50) |
||
03/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1930. Dep: 14/11/1930. | ||
11/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1933. Dep: 24/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2385 (Diagram 50) |
||
07/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1937. Dep: 18/05/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1956 (Diagram 50) |
||
02/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/08/1937. Dep: 01/09/1937. | ||
12/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1940. Dep: 09/04/1940. | ||
06/07/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
21/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1942. Dep: 09/06/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number AW28 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
19/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1945. Dep: 09/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2433 (Diagram 50) |
||
1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1946. Dep: 22/11/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3391 |
||
20/07/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
30/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1948. Dep: 17/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2637 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63391 |
||
10/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1951. Dep: 29/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24201 (Diagram 50A) |
||
09/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/10/1951. Dep: 13/10/1951. | ||
21/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1955. Dep: 02/09/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24244 (Diagram 50) |
||
01/07/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (51G) | ||
29/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/07/1957. Dep: 11/09/1957. | ||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
22/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1958. Dep: 18/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24236 (Diagram 50A) |
||
31/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/03/1960. Dep: 11/05/1960. | ||
31/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/08/1962. Dep: 25/09/1962. | ||
30/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 30/10/1962. Dep: 30/10/1962. | ||
18/03/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1963. Dep: 24/04/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24240 (Diagram 50A) |
||
30/04/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/04/1963. Dep: 07/05/1963. | ||
12/04/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63391 from West Hartlepool (51C) |