|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 28/06/1923 | 26/09/1923 | 91 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/01/1926 | 22/04/1926 | 93 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 23/09/1926 | 15/10/1926 | 23 days | Light Repair | Lifted for heating |
||
Darlington Works | 10/09/1928 | 30/10/1928 | 51 days | General | Boiler number D190 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/08/1929 | 26/09/1929 | 32 days | General | Boiler number E4/45 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/12/1931 | 22/01/1932 | 53 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/03/1934 | 04/04/1934 | 28 days | General | Boiler number E4/21 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/09/1936 | 13/11/1936 | 52 days | General | Boiler number D1941 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1939 | 24/02/1939 | 33 days | General | Boiler number HL105 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1939 | 18/09/1939 | 42 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 21/09/1939 | 07/10/1939 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/09/1940 | 21/10/1940 | 28 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 19/06/1942 | 17/07/1942 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3138 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/04/1944 | 09/05/1944 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 3013 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 04/07/1945 | 01/08/1945 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 28/05/1946 | 11/06/1946 | 15 days | Special | Exam |
||
Darlington Works | 24/06/1946 | 20/07/1946 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 2425 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 24/11/1947 | 12/12/1947 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 14/04/1948 | 30/04/1948 | 17 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63392 |
||
Darlington Works | 10/03/1949 | 01/04/1949 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 2569 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/05/1952 | 14/06/1952 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 24280 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/06/1952 | 17/06/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/06/1955 | 08/07/1955 | 24 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 27/12/1956 | 24/01/1957 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 16/01/1958 | 12/03/1958 | 56 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 10/02/1959 | 06/03/1959 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24294 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/03/1959 | 24/03/1959 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1960 | 29/11/1960 | 55 days | Heavy Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. | SLS/194905 |
30/04/1949 | Darlington Works | New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84. Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460. |
SLS/194906 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1918 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2235 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Stockton (SKN) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
28/06/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1923. Dep: 26/09/1923. | ||
20/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1926. Dep: 22/04/1926. | ||
23/09/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/09/1926. Dep: 15/10/1926. Work undertaken: Lifted for heating |
||
10/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1928. Dep: 30/10/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D190 (Diagram 50) |
||
26/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1929. Dep: 26/09/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/45 (Diagram 50) |
||
09/06/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
01/12/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1931. Dep: 22/01/1932. | ||
08/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1934. Dep: 04/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/21 (Diagram 50) |
||
23/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1936. Dep: 13/11/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1941 (Diagram 50) |
||
17/11/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
23/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1939. Dep: 24/02/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL105 (Diagram 50) |
||
08/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/08/1939. Dep: 18/09/1939. | ||
21/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/09/1939. Dep: 07/10/1939. | ||
16/10/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
01/04/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
24/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/09/1940. Dep: 21/10/1940. | ||
19/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1942. Dep: 17/07/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3138 (Diagram 50A) |
||
03/09/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
04/12/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
17/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1944. Dep: 09/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3013 (Diagram 50A) |
||
04/11/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
05/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
04/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/07/1945. Dep: 01/08/1945. | ||
28/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Special) - Arr: 28/05/1946. Dep: 11/06/1946. Work undertaken: Exam |
||
22/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3392 | ||
24/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1946. Dep: 20/07/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2425 (Diagram 50) |
||
24/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/11/1947. Dep: 12/12/1947. | ||
14/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/04/1948. Dep: 30/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63392 |
||
10/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1949. Dep: 01/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2569 (Diagram 50) |
||
26/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1952. Dep: 14/06/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24280 (Diagram 50A) |
||
16/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/06/1952. Dep: 17/06/1952. | ||
15/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/06/1955. Dep: 08/07/1955. | ||
27/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/12/1956. Dep: 24/01/1957. | ||
16/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/01/1958. Dep: 12/03/1958. | ||
10/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1959. Dep: 06/03/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24294 (Diagram 50A) |
||
17/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/03/1959. Dep: 24/03/1959. | ||
06/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 06/10/1960. Dep: 29/11/1960. | ||
18/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63392 from West Hartlepool (51C) |