Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 498 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5099 Week
» 16646 Month
» 416328 Year
» 492915 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NER 2238   12/1918
LNER (1946) 3395   15/09/1946
BR 63395 w/e 19/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Raven
Class Q6
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q612/1918
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number 131A
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 12/1918 to Blaydon (BLA)
Withdrawal Sat 09/09/1967 off Sunderland (52G)
Service Life 48 yrs, 9 mths , 10 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for preservation 29/10/67

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BLA Blaydon (New) 12/1918
NPT Newport (Teeside) 28/03/1943
DAR Darlington 04/12/1943
WHL West Hartlepool 05/03/1945
HLD Hull Dairycoates 04/09/1949
SEL Selby 01/12/1949
51A Darlington 14/06/1959
52G Sunderland 07/05/1965
   Withdrawn 09/09/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/09/1949
ALLOC SEL Selby w/e 03/12/1949
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 52K Consett 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 19/06/1965
WDN   4w/e 09/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1918 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D855)
13/06/1928 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number E4/14)
06/10/1932 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number E4/35)
27/02/1936 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D1939)
16/09/1939 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2569)
12/05/1942 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2388)
07/12/1944 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number HL109)
07/12/1944 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 988)
15/11/1946 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2441)
21/05/1949 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2817)
11/01/1952 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24277)
09/12/1955 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24255)
21/03/1958 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24286)
08/03/1961 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24332)
30/09/1965 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24251)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 29/07/1924 01/10/1924 65 days General  
Gateshead Works 11/04/1928 13/06/1928 64 days General
Boiler number E4/14 (Diagram 50)
 
Gateshead Works 07/11/1929 10/12/1929 34 days Heavy  
Gateshead Works 22/04/1931 12/05/1931 21 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 29/08/1932 06/10/1932 39 days General
Boiler number E4/35 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 02/01/1936 27/02/1936 57 days General
Boiler number D1939 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 17/08/1939 16/09/1939 31 days General
Boiler number 2569 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 10/04/1942 12/05/1942 33 days General
Boiler number 2388 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 11/11/1944 07/12/1944 27 days General
Boiler number 988 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 16/10/1946 15/11/1946 31 days General
Boiler number 2441 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 02/04/1947 18/04/1947 17 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 14/05/1948 18/06/1948 36 days Heavy
Renumbered to BR 63395
 
Darlington Works 29/04/1949 21/05/1949 23 days General
Boiler number 2817 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 23/05/1949 28/05/1949 6 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 07/12/1951 11/01/1952 36 days General
Boiler number 24277 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 26/10/1953 20/11/1953 26 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 16/11/1955 09/12/1955 24 days General
Boiler number 24255 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 18/02/1958 21/03/1958 32 days General
Boiler number 24286 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 28/09/1959 05/10/1959 8 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 05/01/1961 08/03/1961 63 days General
Boiler number 24332 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 29/11/1961 29/11/1961 1 day Unclassified  
Darlington Works 08/02/1963 08/02/1963 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 12/08/1965 30/09/1965 50 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 4061 (Diagram 50A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1918 To Service To service as NER Number 2238
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Blaydon (BLA)
Diagram 50 boiler fitted
   
29/07/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1924. Dep: 01/10/1924.    
11/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1928. Dep: 13/06/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number E4/14 (Diagram 50)
   
07/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/11/1929. Dep: 10/12/1929.    
22/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/04/1931. Dep: 12/05/1931.    
29/08/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1932. Dep: 06/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number E4/35 (Diagram 50)
   
02/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1936. Dep: 27/02/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1939 (Diagram 50)
   
17/08/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1939. Dep: 16/09/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2569 (Diagram 50)
   
10/04/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1942. Dep: 12/05/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2388 (Diagram 50)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
04/12/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
11/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1944. Dep: 07/12/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 988 (Diagram 50)
   
05/03/1945 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
15/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3395    
16/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1946. Dep: 15/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2441 (Diagram 50)
   
02/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/04/1947. Dep: 18/04/1947.    
14/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Heavy) - Arr: 14/05/1948. Dep: 18/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63395
   
29/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1949. Dep: 21/05/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2817 (Diagram 50)
   
23/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/05/1949. Dep: 28/05/1949.    
04/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
01/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
07/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1951. Dep: 11/01/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24277 (Diagram 50A)
   
26/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/10/1953. Dep: 20/11/1953.    
16/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1955. Dep: 09/12/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24255 (Diagram 50A)
   
18/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1958. Dep: 21/03/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24286 (Diagram 50A)
   
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
28/09/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/09/1959. Dep: 05/10/1959.    
05/01/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1961. Dep: 08/03/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24332 (Diagram 50A)
   
29/11/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/11/1961. Dep: 29/11/1961.    
08/02/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 08/02/1963. Dep: 08/02/1963.    
07/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
12/08/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/08/1965. Dep: 30/09/1965.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4061 (Diagram 50A)
   
09/09/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 63395 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev