|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 07/10/1924 | 10/12/1924 | 65 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/05/1926 | 27/10/1926 | 153 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 21/06/1929 | 23/08/1929 | 64 days | General | Boiler number E4/19 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 03/10/1929 | 16/10/1929 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 06/11/1931 | 16/12/1931 | 41 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/09/1934 | 24/10/1934 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 2386 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/04/1937 | 02/06/1937 | 44 days | General | Boiler number AW44 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1940 | 11/06/1940 | 23 days | General | Boiler number AW34 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/06/1942 | 11/07/1942 | 30 days | General | Boiler number HL107 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/04/1943 | 13/05/1943 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 29/11/1944 | 06/01/1945 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2388 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/07/1945 | 15/09/1945 | 58 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 06/10/1946 | 18/10/1946 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 26/01/1948 | 27/02/1948 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 3335 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3404 |
||
Darlington Works | 08/03/1948 | 22/03/1948 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 27/03/1950 | 11/05/1950 | 46 days | Light Casual | Renumbered to BR 63404 |
||
Darlington Works | 08/02/1951 | 06/03/1951 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24168 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 18/11/1952 | 27/11/1952 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 15/10/1953 | 14/11/1953 | 31 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 16/11/1953 | 16/11/1953 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 14/09/1955 | 14/10/1955 | 31 days | Light Casual | After derailment |
||
Darlington Works | 21/11/1956 | 14/12/1956 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 24235 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/10/1960 | 18/11/1960 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24329 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/09/1964 | 29/09/1964 | 1 day | Weighing |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/02/1948 | Darlington Works | On 7/2 new 'L.1's' up to No. 9006 were complete and painted in North Road yard, Nos. 9001/2 are Darlington 2020/1 of 1948. Nos. 9001-3 are painted green and lettered L.N.E.R., while 9004 and upwards have 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and the numbers on the bunkers; it is understood that they will be fitted with electric light and Westinghouse brakes. Nos. 9001/2 are at present working from Darlington on Saltburn turns. 'B.1' No. 1062 has been painted green and it is understood that 'B.1's' as they come in for shops will be dealt with in a similar manner. Locomotives awaiting Shops or scrapping during January included: 819, 958, 1881, 2111/2, 2361, 2713/8, 2939/41, 3124, 3252, 3339, 3404, 4756, 4860, 5030/44/98, 5639/45/46, 5769, 5804/31/49/78, 7266/74, 7608/43, 8308, 8402, 8725/27, 9379/86, 9422, 9775 an 9835, and Rail Cars Recovery and Hope. Locomotives ex Shops included: Nos. 1068, 1466, 2354/60/74/95, 3408/39/60, 5037, 5705/13/36/73, 7309/21, 7625/57, 8230/98, 8304, 8702/48, 9117, 9431, 9778/95/99, 9835/39/41/79/86/90. It is believed that the first two locomotives to be painted here with the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to have the number prefixed with an 'E' were Nos. E5696 and E5663, during W/E 31/1; all locomotives off North Road are now appearing in a similar manner. 'B.1's' Nos. 1273-6 have arrived at Bank Top shed, the first lot of a further ten to be allocated here; these will replace 'J.39's' which are going elsewhere | SLS/194803 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1919 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2247 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
07/10/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1924. Dep: 10/12/1924. | ||
16/02/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
28/05/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1926. Dep: 27/10/1926. | ||
01/02/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
21/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1929. Dep: 23/08/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/19 (Diagram 50) |
||
03/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/10/1929. Dep: 16/10/1929. | ||
06/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1931. Dep: 16/12/1931. | ||
02/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1934. Dep: 24/10/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2386 (Diagram 50) |
||
21/11/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
20/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1937. Dep: 02/06/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number AW44 (Diagram 50) |
||
08/06/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
17/07/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
02/03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
20/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1940. Dep: 11/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number AW34 (Diagram 50) |
||
15/02/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
12/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1942. Dep: 11/07/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL107 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
22/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/04/1943. Dep: 13/05/1943. | ||
29/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1944. Dep: 06/01/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2388 (Diagram 50) |
||
20/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/07/1945. Dep: 15/09/1945. | ||
14/01/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Consett (CON) | ||
25/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3404 | ||
06/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/10/1946. Dep: 18/10/1946. | ||
26/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1948. Dep: 27/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3335 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3404 |
||
08/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/03/1948. Dep: 22/03/1948. | ||
27/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/03/1950. Dep: 11/05/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63404 |
||
08/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1951. Dep: 06/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24168 (Diagram 50A) |
||
18/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/11/1952. Dep: 27/11/1952. | ||
15/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 15/10/1953. Dep: 14/11/1953. | ||
16/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/11/1953. Dep: 16/11/1953. | ||
14/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/09/1955. Dep: 14/10/1955. Work undertaken: After derailment |
||
21/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1956. Dep: 14/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24235 (Diagram 50A) |
||
17/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1960. Dep: 18/11/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24329 (Diagram 50A) |
||
06/05/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
29/09/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 29/09/1964. Dep: 29/09/1964. | ||
17/05/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63404 from Sunderland (52G) |