Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 169 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 169 Week
» 39215 Month
» 413228 Year
» 1634793 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2247 m/e 06/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3404   25/08/1946
British Railways (BR Tmp) E3404   27/02/1948
British Railways 63404 on 11/05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class Q6
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q606/1919
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number 141A
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 06/1919 to Borough Gardens (BOR)
Withdrawal Mon 17/05/1965 off Sunderland (52G)
Service Life 45 yrs, 11 mths , 16 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to M Baum, Middlesbrough, 6/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BOR Borough Gardens (New) m/e 06/1919
HLS Hull Springhead on 16/02/1925
BOR Borough Gardens on 01/02/1927
HTN Heaton on 21/11/1934
BLA Blaydon on 08/06/1937
HTN Heaton on 17/07/1939
TDK Tyne Dock on 02/03/1940
BLA Blaydon on 15/02/1941
NPT Newport (Teeside) on 28/03/1943
CON Consett on 14/01/1946
52G Sunderland on 06/05/1962
   Withdrawn on 17/05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 02/06/1962
WDN   m/e 31/07/1962
WDN   w/e 17/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D930)
23/08/1929 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number E4/19)
24/10/1934 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2386)
02/06/1937 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number AW44)
11/06/1940 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number AW34)
11/07/1942 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number HL107)
06/01/1945 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2388)
27/02/1948 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 3335)
06/03/1951 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24168)
14/12/1956 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24235)
18/11/1960 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24329)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 07/10/1924 10/12/1924 65 days General  
Darlington Works 28/05/1926 27/10/1926 153 days General  
Gateshead Works 21/06/1929 23/08/1929 64 days General
Boiler number E4/19 (Diagram 50)
 
Gateshead Works 03/10/1929 16/10/1929 14 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 06/11/1931 16/12/1931 41 days General  
Darlington Works 02/09/1934 24/10/1934 53 days General
Boiler number 2386 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 20/04/1937 02/06/1937 44 days General
Boiler number AW44 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 20/05/1940 11/06/1940 23 days General
Boiler number AW34 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 12/06/1942 11/07/1942 30 days General
Boiler number HL107 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 22/04/1943 13/05/1943 22 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 29/11/1944 06/01/1945 39 days General
Boiler number 2388 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 20/07/1945 15/09/1945 58 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 06/10/1946 18/10/1946 13 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 26/01/1948 27/02/1948 33 days General
Boiler number 3335 (Diagram 50A)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3404
 
Darlington Works 08/03/1948 22/03/1948 15 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 27/03/1950 11/05/1950 46 days Light Casual
Renumbered to BR 63404
 
Darlington Works 08/02/1951 06/03/1951 27 days General
Boiler number 24168 (Diagram 50A)
 
Gateshead Works 18/11/1952 27/11/1952 10 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 15/10/1953 14/11/1953 31 days Light Intermediate  
Darlington Works 16/11/1953 16/11/1953 1 day Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 14/09/1955 14/10/1955 31 days Light Casual
After derailment
 
Darlington Works 21/11/1956 14/12/1956 24 days General
Boiler number 24235 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 17/10/1960 18/11/1960 33 days General
Boiler number 24329 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 29/09/1964 29/09/1964 1 day Weighing  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/02/1948 Darlington Works On 7/2 new 'L.1's' up to No. 9006 were complete and painted in North Road yard, Nos. 9001/2 are Darlington 2020/1 of 1948. Nos. 9001-3 are painted green and lettered L.N.E.R., while 9004 and upwards have 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and the numbers on the bunkers; it is understood that they will be fitted with electric light and Westinghouse brakes. Nos. 9001/2 are at present working from Darlington on Saltburn turns. 'B.1' No. 1062 has been painted green and it is understood that 'B.1's' as they come in for shops will be dealt with in a similar manner. Locomotives awaiting Shops or scrapping during January included: 819, 958, 1881, 2111/2, 2361, 2713/8, 2939/41, 3124, 3252, 3339, 3404, 4756, 4860, 5030/44/98, 5639/45/46, 5769, 5804/31/49/78, 7266/74, 7608/43, 8308, 8402, 8725/27, 9379/86, 9422, 9775 an 9835, and Rail Cars Recovery and Hope. Locomotives ex Shops included: Nos. 1068, 1466, 2354/60/74/95, 3408/39/60, 5037, 5705/13/36/73, 7309/21, 7625/57, 8230/98, 8304, 8702/48, 9117, 9431, 9778/95/99, 9835/39/41/79/86/90. It is believed that the first two locomotives to be painted here with the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to have the number prefixed with an 'E' were Nos. E5696 and E5663, during W/E 31/1; all locomotives off North Road are now appearing in a similar manner. 'B.1's' Nos. 1273-6 have arrived at Bank Top shed, the first lot of a further ten to be allocated here; these will replace 'J.39's' which are going elsewhere SLS/194803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2247
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Borough Gardens (BOR)
Diagram 50 boiler fitted
   
16/02/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
01/02/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR)    
21/11/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
08/06/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
17/07/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
02/03/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
15/02/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
14/01/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Consett (CON)    
25/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3404    
06/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
17/05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63404 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev