|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 06/11/1923 | 30/01/1924 | 86 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1925 | 22/03/1926 | 98 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 07/12/1928 | 23/01/1929 | 48 days | General | Boiler number E4/29 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/06/1933 | 31/07/1933 | 46 days | General | Boiler number E4/1 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/03/1934 | 21/06/1934 | 106 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 05/03/1937 | 16/04/1937 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2262 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/07/1940 | 12/08/1940 | 29 days | General | Boiler number AW19 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1940 | 19/08/1940 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/11/1941 | 10/12/1941 | 37 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1943 | 01/07/1943 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2817 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/02/1946 | 16/03/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2561 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3409 |
||
Darlington Works | 06/04/1948 | 06/05/1948 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2658 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63409 |
||
Darlington Works | 22/06/1949 | 12/07/1949 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 05/06/1950 | 13/07/1950 | 39 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 03/09/1951 | 28/09/1951 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24203 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/03/1953 | 16/04/1953 | 23 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 24253 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/12/1953 | 05/01/1954 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 24/02/1956 | 26/03/1956 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24164 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/10/1958 | 11/11/1958 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 24254 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/11/1958 | 26/11/1958 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/12/1958 | 05/01/1959 | 28 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/03/1959 | 02/04/1959 | 31 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 03/11/1959 | 05/11/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/01/1961 | 03/02/1961 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 25/06/1962 | 22/08/1962 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 24270 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/08/1962 | 13/09/1962 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/09/1962 | 25/09/1962 | 8 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/07/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D15, D238, D347, D2232/42, D2701, D3075, D3237, D5112, D4190-2 undercoats, D4193-5 motors fitted to body shells, 43054, 60876, 60955/7, 61018, 63343, 63409/10/26, 68037, 90322, 90622/51, 92061/2. Stripping Shop: 65786, 90008, 90132. Outside Stripping Shop: 63423, 65757. Crossing: D24, D244/6/83, D2604. Diesel Shunter Test House: D4189 painted. Sidings: 60953/62/81, 61010, 63368, 63456, 65099, 65720, 65807, 67634, 67788, 68014, 69026, 90113, 92034. Scrap Yard: 61077 being cut up, 61063, 61265/98, 61415/9/43/50/1, 65693, 65751, 67666, 67753/95 partially dismantled, 61411-3/60, 65695, 65741, 67601/23/60, 67707/47/50/75, 68052, 68707, 69017/97 intact. | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1919 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2252 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
06/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1923. Dep: 30/01/1924. | ||
08/12/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
15/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1925. Dep: 22/03/1926. | ||
31/03/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
07/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1928. Dep: 23/01/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/29 (Diagram 50) |
||
26/01/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
07/11/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
16/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1933. Dep: 31/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/1 (Diagram 50) |
||
08/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/03/1934. Dep: 21/06/1934. | ||
05/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1937. Dep: 16/04/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2262 (Diagram 50) |
||
15/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1940. Dep: 12/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number AW19 (Diagram 50) |
||
12/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/08/1940. Dep: 19/08/1940. | ||
14/05/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
04/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 04/11/1941. Dep: 10/12/1941. | ||
14/09/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
20/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1943. Dep: 01/07/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2817 (Diagram 50) |
||
16/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1946. Dep: 16/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2561 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3409 |
||
06/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1948. Dep: 06/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2658 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63409 |
||
15/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
22/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/06/1949. Dep: 12/07/1949. | ||
05/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 05/06/1950. Dep: 13/07/1950. | ||
03/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1951. Dep: 28/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24203 (Diagram 50) |
||
25/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/03/1953. Dep: 16/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24253 (Diagram 50) |
||
03/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/12/1953. Dep: 05/01/1954. | ||
24/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1956. Dep: 26/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24164 (Diagram 50A) |
||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
14/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1958. Dep: 11/11/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24254 (Diagram 50A) |
||
19/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/11/1958. Dep: 26/11/1958. | ||
09/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/12/1958. Dep: 05/01/1959. | ||
03/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/03/1959. Dep: 02/04/1959. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
03/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/11/1959. Dep: 05/11/1959. | ||
30/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/01/1961. Dep: 03/02/1961. | ||
25/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1962. Dep: 22/08/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24270 (Diagram 50A) |
||
30/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/08/1962. Dep: 13/09/1962. | ||
18/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/09/1962. Dep: 25/09/1962. | ||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
11/09/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63409 from Tyne Dock (52H) |