|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 07/01/1925 | 15/04/1925 | 99 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 04/06/1927 | 23/08/1927 | 81 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 03/02/1930 | 22/03/1930 | 48 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 03/12/1931 | 06/01/1932 | 35 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 01/06/1933 | 04/07/1933 | 34 days | General | Boiler number DS04 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/04/1935 | 17/05/1935 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2384 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1937 | 23/04/1937 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2888 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/12/1938 | 10/01/1939 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/01/1940 | 13/02/1940 | 34 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/12/1941 | 06/01/1942 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 24247 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/04/1944 | 12/05/1944 | 21 days | General | Boiler number 2888 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 19/08/1945 | 29/08/1945 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 19/07/1946 | 31/08/1946 | 44 days | Unclassified | Boiler number 2386 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3410 |
||
Darlington Works | 12/09/1946 | 14/09/1946 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 03/05/1948 | 14/05/1948 | 12 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63410 |
||
Darlington Works | 29/03/1949 | 30/06/1949 | 94 days | General | Boiler number 3013 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/06/1952 | 19/07/1952 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 24154 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/05/1955 | 18/06/1955 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24249 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/12/1957 | 25/01/1958 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 24297 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/09/1960 | 08/11/1960 | 40 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 08/06/1962 | 10/08/1962 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 24268 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1964 | 07/05/1964 | 1 day | Weighing |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/07/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D15, D238, D347, D2232/42, D2701, D3075, D3237, D5112, D4190-2 undercoats, D4193-5 motors fitted to body shells, 43054, 60876, 60955/7, 61018, 63343, 63409/10/26, 68037, 90322, 90622/51, 92061/2. Stripping Shop: 65786, 90008, 90132. Outside Stripping Shop: 63423, 65757. Crossing: D24, D244/6/83, D2604. Diesel Shunter Test House: D4189 painted. Sidings: 60953/62/81, 61010, 63368, 63456, 65099, 65720, 65807, 67634, 67788, 68014, 69026, 90113, 92034. Scrap Yard: 61077 being cut up, 61063, 61265/98, 61415/9/43/50/1, 65693, 65751, 67666, 67753/95 partially dismantled, 61411-3/60, 65695, 65741, 67601/23/60, 67707/47/50/75, 68052, 68707, 69017/97 intact. | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1919 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2253 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1 Allocated to Stockton (SKN) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
03/05/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (THJ) | ||
31/10/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
07/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1925. Dep: 15/04/1925. | ||
04/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1927. Dep: 23/08/1927. | ||
03/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1930. Dep: 22/03/1930. | ||
09/06/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
09/04/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
03/12/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/12/1931. Dep: 06/01/1932. | ||
01/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1933. Dep: 04/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number DS04 (Diagram 50) |
||
12/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1935. Dep: 17/05/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2384 (Diagram 50) |
||
18/01/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
22/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1937. Dep: 23/04/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2888 (Diagram 50) |
||
29/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/12/1938. Dep: 10/01/1939. | ||
11/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1940. Dep: 13/02/1940. | ||
01/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1941. Dep: 06/01/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24247 (Diagram 50) |
||
26/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
22/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1944. Dep: 12/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2888 (Diagram 50) |
||
02/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
19/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/08/1945. Dep: 29/08/1945. | ||
19/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/07/1946. Dep: 31/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2386 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3410 |
||
12/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/09/1946. Dep: 14/09/1946. | ||
04/05/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
03/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/05/1948. Dep: 14/05/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63410 |
||
29/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1949. Dep: 30/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3013 (Diagram 50A) |
||
30/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1952. Dep: 19/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24154 (Diagram 50A) |
||
24/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1955. Dep: 18/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24249 (Diagram 50A) |
||
23/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1957. Dep: 25/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24297 (Diagram 50A) |
||
30/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 30/09/1960. Dep: 08/11/1960. | ||
08/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1962. Dep: 10/08/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24268 (Diagram 50A) |
||
07/05/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 07/05/1964. Dep: 07/05/1964. | ||
05/06/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63410 from West Hartlepool (51C) |