|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 01/10/1924 | 18/12/1924 | 79 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 23/08/1927 | 15/11/1927 | 85 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/02/1930 | 28/03/1930 | 46 days | General | Boiler number D656 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/01/1933 | 10/02/1933 | 28 days | General | Boiler number HL985 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/05/1935 | 11/07/1935 | 44 days | General | Boiler number D935 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/06/1937 | 28/10/1937 | 130 days | General | Boiler number HL112 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/08/1939 | 17/10/1939 | 51 days | General | Boiler number HL111 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/05/1942 | 30/06/1942 | 34 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1944 | 24/06/1944 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 2570 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 29/11/1945 | 17/12/1945 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 10/01/1947 | 22/02/1947 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2819 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 17/11/1948 | 03/12/1948 | 17 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63413 |
||
Darlington Works | 30/03/1950 | 28/04/1950 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24191 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 10/05/1951 | 06/06/1951 | 28 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 07/04/1952 | 01/05/1952 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 16/12/1952 | 17/01/1953 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gateshead Works | 05/07/1955 | 29/07/1955 | 25 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/11/1955 | 23/12/1955 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24285 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/02/1960 | 19/03/1960 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24168 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/08/1963 | 10/10/1963 | 45 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 22/10/1963 | 23/10/1963 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/06/1965 | 02/06/1965 | 1 day | Weighing |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
03/12/1966 | Allocation of Q6 class (Tyne Dock) | Tyne Dock: 63344/66/81/7, 63413/20/6/9/31/55/8; Sunderland: 63346/95, 63405/36/7; West Hartlepool: 63368/94/7, 63407/40/50. | SLS/196701 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2256 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 4 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
01/10/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1924. Dep: 18/12/1924. | ||
1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
23/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1927. Dep: 15/11/1927. | ||
11/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1930. Dep: 28/03/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D656 (Diagram 50) |
||
14/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1933. Dep: 10/02/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL985 (Diagram 50) |
||
29/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1935. Dep: 11/07/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D935 (Diagram 50) |
||
21/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1937. Dep: 28/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL112 (Diagram 50) |
||
19/06/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
28/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1939. Dep: 17/10/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL111 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1942. Dep: 30/06/1942. | ||
01/02/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
06/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1944. Dep: 24/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2570 (Diagram 50) |
||
29/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/11/1945. Dep: 17/12/1945. | ||
15/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3413 | ||
10/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1947. Dep: 22/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2819 (Diagram 50) |
||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
17/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/11/1948. Dep: 03/12/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63413 |
||
30/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1950. Dep: 28/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24191 (Diagram 50A) |
||
10/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 10/05/1951. Dep: 06/06/1951. | ||
07/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/04/1952. Dep: 01/05/1952. | ||
16/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/12/1952. Dep: 17/01/1953. | ||
05/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/07/1955. Dep: 29/07/1955. | ||
28/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1955. Dep: 23/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24285 (Diagram 50A) |
||
18/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1960. Dep: 19/03/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24168 (Diagram 50A) |
||
23/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
27/08/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/08/1963. Dep: 10/10/1963. | ||
22/10/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/10/1963. Dep: 23/10/1963. | ||
02/06/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 02/06/1965. Dep: 02/06/1965. | ||
09/01/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
23/01/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63413 from Tyne Dock (52H) |