|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 07/07/1922 | 12/09/1922 | 68 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 14/10/1924 | 05/01/1925 | 84 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 13/07/1926 | 21/10/1926 | 101 days | Heavy | |||
Gateshead Works | 07/12/1928 | 24/01/1929 | 49 days | General | Boiler number D703 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 03/06/1931 | 24/07/1931 | 52 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/08/1934 | 05/12/1934 | 124 days | General | Boiler number AW19 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/08/1938 | 23/11/1938 | 97 days | General | Boiler number 24268 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1941 | 06/02/1941 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 26/08/1942 | 30/09/1942 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3305 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/01/1944 | 26/01/1944 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 03/01/1945 | 03/02/1945 | 32 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 26/03/1946 | 09/04/1946 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3416 |
||
Darlington Works | 30/06/1947 | 21/08/1947 | 53 days | General | Boiler number HL112 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 15/10/1948 | 28/10/1948 | 14 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63416 |
||
Darlington Works | 24/01/1950 | 17/03/1950 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 24175 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/12/1950 | 19/01/1951 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 18/03/1952 | 08/04/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 24216 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1954 | 24/10/1954 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 24185 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/10/1956 | 10/10/1956 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1957 | 05/04/1957 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24306 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/01/1960 | 25/02/1960 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 24152 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/08/1962 | 27/08/1962 | 26 days | Light Casual | After collision |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2259 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 7 Allocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
07/07/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1922. Dep: 12/09/1922. | ||
14/10/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1924. Dep: 05/01/1925. | ||
13/07/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Heavy) - Arr: 13/07/1926. Dep: 21/10/1926. | ||
07/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1928. Dep: 24/01/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number D703 (Diagram 50) |
||
03/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1931. Dep: 24/07/1931. | ||
04/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1934. Dep: 05/12/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number AW19 (Diagram 50) |
||
19/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1938. Dep: 23/11/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24268 (Diagram 50A) |
||
23/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
25/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/01/1941. Dep: 06/02/1941. | ||
26/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1942. Dep: 30/09/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3305 (Diagram 50A) |
||
03/09/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
04/12/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
04/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/01/1944. Dep: 26/01/1944. | ||
03/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1945. Dep: 03/02/1945. | ||
26/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/03/1946. Dep: 09/04/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3416 |
||
30/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1947. Dep: 21/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL112 (Diagram 50) |
||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
15/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/10/1948. Dep: 28/10/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63416 |
||
24/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1950. Dep: 17/03/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24175 (Diagram 50) |
||
18/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/12/1950. Dep: 19/01/1951. | ||
18/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1952. Dep: 08/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24216 (Diagram 50) |
||
06/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1954. Dep: 24/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24185 (Diagram 50) |
||
10/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 10/10/1956. Dep: 10/10/1956. | ||
11/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1957. Dep: 05/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24306 (Diagram 50A) |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
22/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1960. Dep: 25/02/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24152 (Diagram 50A) |
||
02/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/08/1962. Dep: 27/08/1962. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
15/07/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63416 from Thornaby (51L) |