Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 320 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2885 Week
» 1623 Month
» 415944 Year
» 1637509 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2261 m/e 02/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3418   01/09/1946
British Railways 63418 w/e 21/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class Q6
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q602/1920
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number E4
Works Number 9
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 02/1920 to Blaydon (BLA)
Withdrawal Mon 15/07/1963 off Sunderland (52G)
Service Life 43 yrs, 5 mths , 14 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 6/8/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BLA Blaydon (New) m/e 02/1920
BOR Borough Gardens on 27/01/1927
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 12/04/1939
YK York (North) on 06/01/1940
NEV Neville Hill on 28/03/1943
CON Consett on 19/06/1943
52G Sunderland on 06/05/1962
   Withdrawn on 15/07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 02/06/1962
WDN   on 15/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1920 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number E4/9)
07/04/1932 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2425)
14/11/1940 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 3152)
24/02/1943 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 2988)
09/03/1946 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 2985)
20/08/1948 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 3017)
19/07/1951 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 24194)
07/10/1954 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24155)
17/05/1957 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 24185)
11/02/1961 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24328)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 06/10/1922 04/01/1923 91 days General  
Gateshead Works 06/09/1923 19/09/1923 14 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 26/05/1925 01/09/1925 99 days General  
Gateshead Works 22/05/1927 14/06/1927 24 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 07/12/1927 23/12/1927 17 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 11/09/1928 05/11/1928 56 days General  
Gateshead Works 03/03/1932 07/04/1932 36 days General
Boiler number 2425 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 01/08/1934 28/08/1934 28 days General  
Darlington Works 27/08/1937 16/10/1937 51 days General  
Darlington Works 16/10/1940 14/11/1940 30 days General
Boiler number 3152 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 30/01/1943 24/02/1943 26 days General
Boiler number 24204 (Diagram 50A)
 
Gateshead Works 20/06/1944 30/06/1944 11 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 08/02/1946 09/03/1946 30 days General
Boiler number 2985 (Diagram 50A)
 
Gateshead Works 03/06/1947 13/06/1947 11 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 08/07/1948 20/08/1948 44 days General
Boiler number 3017 (Diagram 50A)
Renumbered to BR 63418
 
Darlington Works 26/06/1951 19/07/1951 24 days General
Boiler number 24194 (Diagram 50)
 
Gateshead Works 07/07/1953 22/08/1953 47 days Heavy Casual  
Gateshead Works 07/12/1953 12/12/1953 6 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 09/08/1954 07/10/1954 60 days General
Boiler number 24155 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 28/05/1956 02/06/1956 6 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 24/05/1957 17/06/1957 25 days General  
Gateshead Works 07/11/1957 08/11/1957 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 30/12/1960 11/02/1961 44 days General
Boiler number 24328 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 06/02/1963 11/03/1963 34 days Unclassified  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August SLS/194810

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1920 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2261
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 9
Allocated to Blaydon (BLA)
Diagram 50 boiler fitted
   
27/01/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR)    
12/04/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
06/01/1940 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
19/06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Consett (CON)    
01/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3418    
17/05/1957 Modification Diagram 50 number 24185 boiler fitted    
06/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
15/07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63418 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev